Reg Transport Services, L.L.C. v. Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram et al
Plaintiff: Reg Transport Services, L.L.C.
Defendant: Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Dutch Miller of Charleston
3Rd Party Defendant: Thermo King of Central Carolinas
Case Number: 2:2019cv00556
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 40 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 39 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Ohio Southern; Case Number 2:18-cv-01176. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 29, 2019 Case transferred to District of USDC SD of West Virginia (Charleston Division).Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (sem) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION and ORDER granting #35 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the alternative, for Transfer of Venue to the extent that it seeks transfer of venue. This matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia, Charleston Division. The Court denies as moot #11 Third Party Defendant Thermo Kings Motion to Dismiss Dutch Miller's Third Party Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, or in the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 7/29/19. (sem) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE: Please notify the Court at #ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with September 2019 mediation. Deadline for notifying the Court is 8/8/2019. (kk2) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 Supplemental Memorandum Supporting re #35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third-Party Complaint of Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram OR, In the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue filed by Third Party Defendants Mountaineer Thermo King, Thermo King of Roanoke. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of George Boone) (Rasmussen, Katherine) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the Third-Party Complaint of Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram OR, In the Alternative, for Transfer of Venue by Third Party Defendants Mountaineer Thermo King, Thermo King of Roanoke. (Rasmussen, Katherine) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery due by 12/1/2019. Dispositive motions due by 1/2/2020. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTATION ORDER granting #33 Motion to Amend Case Deadlines. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/26/2019. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Preliminary Pretrial Order, by Third Party Defendants Mountaineer Thermo King, Thermo King of Roanoke. (Becker, Gary) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 32 DEFENDANT THERMO KING OF CENTRAL CAROLINAS D/B/A THERMO KING OF ROANOKE AND THERMO KING OF CENTRAL CAROLINAS D/B/A MOUNTAINEER THERMO KING'S ANSWER to #20 Third Party Complaint OF THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF DUTCH MILLER CHRYSLER/JEEP/RAM filed by Thermo King of Roanoke. (Rasmussen, Katherine) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Rasmussen for ThirdParty Defendant Thermo King of Roanoke (Rasmussen, Katherine) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah D. Morrison for all further proceedings. Judge Algenon L. Marbley no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/19/19. (jcw) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Mountaineer Thermo King answer due 6/24/2019; Thermo King of Roanoke answer due 6/24/2019. (er) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 29 STIPULATION Granting Defendants Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by ThirdParty Plaintiff Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram, Third Party Defendants Mountaineer Thermo King, Thermo King of Roanoke. (Becker, Gary) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Edward Becker for Third Party Defendants Thermo King of Roanoke, Mountaineer Thermo King (Becker, Gary) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 27 Alias Summons Issued as to Thermo King of Roanoke. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 4, 2019 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Thermo King of Roanoke. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 25 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gould, Charles) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 24 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Gould, Charles) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Thermo King of Roanoke. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Mountaineer Thermo King (Gould, Charles) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. Thermo King of Roanoke (Gould, Charles) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 20 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Thermo King of Roanoke, filed by Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (daf) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPINION and ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 4/22/2019. (daf) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion for Leave w/Exhibits) (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform Court via email by 2/15/2019 if case should not be set for March 2019 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/28/2019. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - The Court STRIKES #14 Certificate of Service and #15 Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures and DIRECTS Plaintiff to cease filing notices or responses until they are used in a proceedings or the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/17/2019. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 15 ***STRICKEN PER #16 ORDER*** NOTICE by Plaintiff Reg Transport Services, LLC Rule 26 Disclosure (Eidy, Sam) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (agm). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 14 ***STRICKEN PER #16 ORDER*** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram Rule 26 (a)(1) Disclosure (Gould, Charles) Modified text on 1/17/2019 (agm). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
January 6, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WV Sec. of State Details of Thermo-King) (Gould, Charles) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
December 23, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Plaintiff Reg Transport Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Shirley Vernon, #2 Affidavit Rebecca Giligan, #3 Affidavit Roger Wood, #4 Exhibit Dutch Miller Website) (Eidy, Sam) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Roger Wood, #3 Exhibit VA SOS, #4 Exhibit NC SOS, #5 Exhibit Thermo King Quote, #6 Exhibit Retail Purchase Agreement, #7 Exhibit Retail Installment Agreement) (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/20/2018. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the March 2019 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2019. Motions to Amend due by 3/1/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 1/15/2019. Primary Expert due by 3/1/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/30/2019. Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Dispositive motions due by 8/30/2019. Settlement Demand due by 1/15/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/20/2018. (daf) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Notation Order: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles K. Gould is GRANTED, conditional upon registration for electronic filing with this Court, or seeking leave to be excused from doing so, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on November 9, 2018. (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (FILING FEE PAID) (Receipt Number 20COL054591) of Charles K. Gould by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified text re fee on 11/9/2018 (jlk). Modified text on 11/14/2018 (daf). [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2018 at 4:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram, filed by Reg Transport Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (jlk) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Defendant Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfield County Court of Common Pleas, case number 18-cv-00549 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6625225), filed by Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 State Court Notice of Removal) (Smith, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Ohio Southern on 7/30/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reg Transport Services, L.L.C. v. Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reg Transport Services, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sam A. Eidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch Miller Chrysler/Jeep/Ram
Represented By: Charles K. Gould
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Dutch Miller of Charleston
Represented By: Charles K. Gould
Represented By: Jeffrey Mark Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Thermo King of Central Carolinas
Represented By: Katherine A. Rasmussen
Represented By: Gary Edward Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?