R Holdings, LLC v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Plaintiff: R Holdings, LLC
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00562
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:9607
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/24/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/7/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/14/2019. Scheduling Conference at 09:30 AM on 10/28/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/4/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/12/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/5/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by CSX Transportation, Inc. (Bresnahan, William)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/8/2019 as to CSX Transportation, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002566088. (ts)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CSX Transportation, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7337391. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R Holdings, LLC v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Harvey D. Peyton
Represented By: Thomas H. Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: William Bresnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?