Tilley et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Tilley and K. B. Tilley
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P., McKesson Corporation, Richard S. Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family, Beverly Sackler, Mallinckrodt PLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jonathon D. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, David A. Sackler, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGx LLC and Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00566
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER #1 Complaint by McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mary Tilley, K. B. Tilley. (Jessee, Russell) (Modified on 9/9/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mary Tilley, K. B. Tilley (Markins, Michael) (Modified on 9/4/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT AND REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS (Form 1A) by K.B. Tilley, Mary Tilley for Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, McKesson Corporation, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family, Richard S. Sackler, Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathon D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, SpecGx LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC with proposed Waiver of Service of Summons Form. (Attachments: #1 AmerisourceBergen, #2 Endo Health Solutions, #3 Endo Pharmaceuticals, #4 Ilene Sackler, #5 Mallinckrodt Enterprises, #6 McKesson, #7 P.F. Laboratories, #8 Par Pharma, #9 Purdue Frederick Company, #10 Purdue Pharma L.P., #11 Purdue Pharma Inc., #12 Rhodes Pharma., Inc., #13 Rhodes Pharam, L.P., #14 Rhodes Technologies, #15 Rhodes Technologies, Ins., #16 Sackler Family Trust, #17 Richard Sackler, #18 Beverly Sackler, #19 David Sackler, #20 Jonathan Sackler, #21 Kathe Sackler, #22 Mortimer Sackler, #23 Theresa Sackler, #24 SpecGX LLC, #25 Mallinckrodt, plc)(Adams, Benjamin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Rhodes Pharaceuticals L.P., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Rhodes Technologies, Rhodes Technologies Inc., Beverly Sackler, David A. Sackler, Jonathon D. Sackler, Kathe A. Sackler, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Richard S. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, SpecGx LLC, The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #2 Summons as to Beverly Sackler, #3 Summons as to David A. Sackler, #4 Summons as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #5 Summons as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #6 Summons as to Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, #7 Summons as to Jonathon D. Sackler, #8 Summons as to Kathe A. Sackler, #9 Summons as to Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC, #10 Summons as to Mallinckrodt PLC, #11 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, #12 Summons as to Mortimer D.A. Sackler, #13 Summons as to Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #14 Summons as to Purdue Pharma L.P., #15 Summons as to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #16 Summons as to Rhodes Pharaceuticals L.P., #17 Summons as to Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., #18 Summons as to Rhodes Technologies Inc., #19 Summons as to Rhodes Technologies, #20 Summons as to Richard S. Sackler, #21 Summons as to SpecGx LLC, #22 Summons as to The P.F. Laboratories, Inc., #23 Summons as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #24 Summons as to Theresa Sackler, #25 Summons as to Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family) (kew)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by K.B. Tilley, Mary Tilley for All Defendants, re: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Actavis, #2 AmerisourceBergen, #3 Endo Health Solutions, #4 Endo Pharmaceuticals, #5 Ilene Sackler, #6 Mallinckrodt Enterprises, #7 Mallinckrodt plc, #8 McKesson, #9 P.F. Laboratories, #10 Par Pharmaceuticals, #11 Purdue Fredrick Company, #12 Purdue Pharma, Inc., #13 Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #14 Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, LP, #15 Rhodes Technolgies Inc., #16 Rhodes Technologies, #17 Sackler Family Trust, #18 Beverly Sackler, #19 David A. Sackler, #20 Jonathan D. Sackler, #21 Kathe Sackler, #22 Mortimer Sackler, #23 Richard Sackler, #24 Theresa Sackler, #25 SpecGX LLC)(Adams, Benjamin)
August 5, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
August 2, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7338291. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tilley et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Tilley
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. B. Tilley
Represented By: Timothy P. Lupardus
Represented By: P. Rodney Jackson
Represented By: Alexander D. McLaughlin
Represented By: L. Dante DiTrapano
Represented By: W. Stuart Calwell
Represented By: R. Booth Goodwin, II
Represented By: Benjamin D. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Meadows
Represented By: Russell D. Jessee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Markins
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: A. L. Emch
Represented By: Gretchen M. Callas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: Stephen D. Annand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC
Represented By: Keith J. George
Represented By: Stephen D. Annand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?