United States of America v. All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation
Interested Party: Michael Shramowiat
Case Number: 2:2019cv00592
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Michael Shramowiat to Stay Civil Action. (Bryant, S.) (Modified on 10/8/2019 to remove party filer) (kew).
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference previously scheduled for 10/17/2019 is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 11/18/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 3/9/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 2/21/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 3/23/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 4/7/2020. Deposition deadline and close of discovery by 4/21/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 5/11/2020, with responses due by 5/26/2020, and replies due by 6/1/2020. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 7/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Settlement Meeting to be held by 7/13/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 7/20/2020, with responses due by 7/27/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 7/16/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 7/23/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Proposed jury instructions due by 8/17/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 9:00 AM on 8/24/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 8/25/2020 at 8:30 AM in Charleston before Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/7/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by United States of America, All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation. (Robeson, Kathleen) (Modified on 10/7/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM returned executed. (ts)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER For reasons appearing to the Court, it is requested that this matter be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Omar Aboulhosn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 8/27/2019. (cc: counsel of record; Benjamin Bryant; USM) (ts)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/13/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/26/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/3/2019. Scheduling Conference at 9:00 AM on 10/17/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/22/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE with Trial By Jury by All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation. (Bryant, S.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 VERIFIED CLAIM of Michael E. Shramowiat, filed on behalf of All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation re: #3 Warrant of Arrest and Notice in Rem Issued. (Bryant, S.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for Verified Complaint of Forfeiture and Notice of Complaint of Forfeiture Against Real Property. (Robeson, Kathleen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Omar Aboulhosn. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew) (Modified on 8/27/2019 to modify magistrate judge referral purusant to #9 order)(ts).
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM ISSUED. Original and 10 copies returned to Kathleen Robeson. (kew)
August 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT OF ARREST AND NOTICE IN REM SUBMITTED by United States of America. (kew)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE by United States of America against All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Funds in the Bank Account in the name of Mountaineer Pain Relief Rehabilitation
Represented By: S. Benjamin Bryant
Represented By: John A. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kathleen Robeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Shramowiat
Represented By: John A. Kessler
Represented By: S. Benjamin Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?