Woodfell v. Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Catherine Renea Woodfell
Defendant: Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00658
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Catherine Renea Woodfell for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Brown, Sarah)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Catherine Renea Woodfell to #10 Response In Opposition. (Brown, Sarah)
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Catherine Renea Woodfell for First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents to Defendant. (Brown, Sarah)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC in opposition to #6 MOTION by Catherine Renea Woodfell to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Zurbuch, Alex)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled. Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/9/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/13/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/30/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/28/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/14/2020. Discovery to close 5/28/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/17/2020, Responses due by 7/1/2020, Replies due by 7/8/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 8/18/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 8/25/2020, with responses due by 9/1/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 8/24/2020, Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 8/31/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2020 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 9/29/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 10/5/2020 in Charleston. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/16/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Catherine Renea Woodfell, Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC. (Brown, Sarah) (Modified on 10/15/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Catherine Renea Woodfell in support of #6 MOTION by Catherine Renea Woodfell to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Brown, Sarah)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Catherine Renea Woodfell to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Brown, Sarah)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/9/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/21/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/28/2019. Scheduling Conference at 10:00 AM on 11/8/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/11/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/19/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC (Zurbuch, Alex)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC. (Zurbuch, Alex)
September 12, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
September 12, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal by Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. ERROR: Unredacted Exhibit D attached. CORRECTION: Exhibit D replaced with redacted version. (ts)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7380710. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts) (Modified on 9/12/2019 to replace exhibit D with redacted version) (ts).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodfell v. Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Renea Woodfell
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Daniel F. Hedges 1
Represented By: Sarah K. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Mortgage Group, LLC
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?