Robinette v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Donald Robinette
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00688
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #12 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Disclosures filed in their entirety. CORRECTION: Disclosures removed and certificate of service retained. (kew)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donald Robinette for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Martin, Joshua) (Modified on 11/18/2019 to remove disclosures filed in their entirety and retain certificate of service) (kew).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Plaintiff's joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/2/2019. Defendant's joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings due by 12/30/2019. Discovery requests to be completed by 4/7/2020. Discovery to close by 5/22/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 3/23/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 4/22/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 5/8/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 6/11/2020. Responses due by 6/25/2020. Replies due by 7/2/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 8/12/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 8/19/2020, with responses due by 8/26/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 8/17/2020. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 8/24/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2020 01:30 PM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 9/23/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 1:30 PM on 9/28/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 9/29/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/5/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Zurich American Insurance Company, Donald Robinette, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Durst, Tiffany) (Modified on 11/7/2019 to add party filers) (kew).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference; the Scheduling Conference is continued to 11/22/2019 at 11:30 a.m. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 11/1/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Zurich American Insurance Company to Continue Scheduling Conference (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Durst, Tiffany)
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Elkins, R.)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Elkins, R.)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/16/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/28/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/4/2019. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 11/15/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/18/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/26/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company (Smallwood, Edward)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Mowen, Kelly)
September 20, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zurich American Insurance Company with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7388520. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinette v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: R. Carter Elkins
Represented By: Laura L. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Gordon Lee Mowen, II
Represented By: Tiffany R. Durst
Represented By: Kelly Calder Mowen
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Robinette
Represented By: Joshua R. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?