Bausley et al v. Biomet Inc et al
Plaintiff: William I. Bausley and Gwen Bausley
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc. and Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00702
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendants Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Legg, Erik)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY for Emily T. Dodane on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. Local counsel: Erik W. Legg. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7460088. (Legg, Erik)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Matthew T. Albaugh on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc., Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC. Local counsel: Erik W. Legg. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7460062. (Legg, Erik)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL by Erik W. Legg on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Legg, Erik)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL by Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of Gwen Bausley, William I. Bausley. (Saunders, Joseph)
October 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL by Matthew Stonestreet on behalf of Gwen Bausley, William I. Bausley. (Stonestreet, Matthew)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Troy N. Giatras on behalf of Gwen Bausley, William I. Bausley. (Giatras, Troy)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Joseph H. Saunders on behalf of William I. Bausley, Gwen Bausley. Local counsel: Troy N. Giatras. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7407022. (Giatras, Troy)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00402. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE: On the court's own motion, Status Conference set for 10/7/19 is RESET to 11/12/2019 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FOURTH TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk)[Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing LLC of Second Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Group 7 Remand Case List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by attys John Winter and Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included the status of discovery in Groups 8A and 8B, remand and transfer of Group 7 cases, and disposition of settled cases. Next status conference set for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs Executive Committees motion to modify future remand/transfer orders [Doc. No. 3767 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/6/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED REMAND/TRANSFER SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines to applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A and B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/2/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REMAND/TRANSFER SHCEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A, and 8B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: The status conference previously scheduled for July 18, 2019 is now RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MAY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE: Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for July 18, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. Winter. The court hears from the parties. Next Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter T. Gallucci.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. The Court hears from parties. The next Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Status Conference to be held on 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/27/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ACTIVATING DISCOVERY GROUP 7 Identifies cases to be included in Group 7 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 12/14/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 7/12/2019. The parties are directed to confer and file a report within 90 days of the date of this order regarding management of all remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-14-18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS: Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference. Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William I Bausley, Gwen Bausley.(Saunders PHV, Joseph) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court affords the plaintiffs 14 days from the date of this order within which to file an amended complaint properly alleging jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/4/18. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Gwen Bausley, William I Bausley re #1 Complaint of Pendency of Other Actions (Saunders PHV, Joseph) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3579513.), filed by William I Bausley, Gwen Bausley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Saunders PHV, Joseph) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 9/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bausley et al v. Biomet Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Stephanie N. Russo
Represented By: Matthew T. Albaugh
Represented By: Emily T. Dodane
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew L. Campbell
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J. Joseph Tanner
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Stephanie N. Russo
Represented By: Matthew T. Albaugh
Represented By: Emily T. Dodane
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Matthew T. Albaugh
Represented By: Emily T. Dodane
Represented By: Erik W. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William I. Bausley
Represented By: Joseph H. Saunders
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Represented By: Matthew Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Bausley
Represented By: Joseph H. Saunders
Represented By: Troy N. Giatras
Represented By: Matthew Stonestreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?