Childress v. Regional Jail Authority et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Keith Childress
Defendant: South Central Regional Jail, Regional Jail Authority and Booking Officers
Case Number: 2:2019cv00714
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER to Jonathan Childress, from USDC Clerk dated 11/1/2019, re: #4 Letter requesting case status. (ts)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER-FORM NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS and request for status update by Jonathan Keith Childress. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (ts)
October 2, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) (Modified on 10/2/2019 to reflect referral type)(ts).
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (ts)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Jonathan Keith Childress to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (Attachment: #1 Resident Transaction Detail) (ts)
October 2, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childress v. Regional Jail Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Central Regional Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Jail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booking Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Keith Childress
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?