Al Marino, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Al Marino, Inc.
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., McKesson Corporation, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Actavis PLC, Cephalon, Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00723
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: David A Faber
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 28 CONFIRMATION from Northern District of Ohio that the case has been opened in that district as 1:19-op-45976, filed 11/06/2019. (st)
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-117) JUDICIAL PANEL ON MDL: certified copy from the Northern District of Ohio transferring this action to the USDC/NDOH for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/30/2019. (cc: attys) (kew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION FROM JUDICIAL PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-117), MDL 2804. (kew)
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Actavis PLC, Actavis, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Actavis PLC, #2 Summons as to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #3 Summons as to Cardinal Health, Inc., #4 Summons as to Cephalon, Inc., #5 Summons as to Endo Health Solutions Inc., #6 Summons as to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #7 Summons as to Insys Therapeutics, Inc., #8 Summons as to Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #9 Summons as to Johnson & Johnson, #10 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, #11 Summons as to McKesson Corporation, #12 Summons as to Purdue Pharma Inc., #13 Summons as to Purdue Pharma L.P., #14 Summons as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., #15 Summons as to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., #16 Summons as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #17 Summons as to The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #18 Summons as to Watson Laboratories, Inc.) (kew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for McKesson Corporation, re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Watson Laboratories, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Purdue Pharma L.P., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Purdue Pharma Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for McKesson Corporation, re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark) (Modified on 10/8/2019 to add link to #4 complaint) (kew).
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Johnson & Johnson, re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Insys Therapeutics, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Endo Health Solutions Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Cephalon, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Cardinal Health, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for AmerisourceBergen Corporation, re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Actavis PLC, re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Al Marino, Inc. for Actavis, Inc., re: #4 Complaint. (Troy, Mark)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Juan Martinez on behalf of Al Marino, Inc. Local counsel: Mark Troy. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7405806. (Troy, Mark)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from James Young on behalf of Al Marino, Inc. Local counsel: Mark Troy. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7405765. (Troy, Mark)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Al Marino, Inc. (Troy, Mark)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7404958. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Marino, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Marino, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Troy
Represented By: Juan Martinez
Represented By: James Dennis Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?