Allred v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tammy Allred
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00741
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1002
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT OF PARTIES' RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Tammy Allred. (McQuain, Elise) (Modified on 12/9/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to 12/23/2019 by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Tammy Allred. (McQuain, Elise) (Modified on 12/9/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the telephonic scheduling conference currently scheduled for 12/06/2019 is CONTINUED to 12/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/4/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to 12/09/2019 by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Tammy Allred. (McQuain, Elise) (Modified on 11/7/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/18/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/25/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/2/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 10:30 AM on 12/6/2019. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/11/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/4/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mms)
October 16, 2019 SET ANSWER DEADLINE for Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company to 11/8/2019. (kew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR ANTHEM BLUE CROSS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE COMPANY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to 11/8/2019 by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Tammy Allred. (McQuain, Elise) (Modified on 10/17/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company (McQuain, Elise)
October 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Error: Incorrect image attached for Exhibit A. Correction: Replaced incorrect image for Exhibit A with correct image. (mkw)
October 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (lca)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company with summons, amended complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Logan County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7411523. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca) (Modified on 10/15/2019 to replace image) (mkw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allred v. Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Allred
Represented By: Michael McDonald Cary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: Elise Nicole McQuain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?