Bowman v. Saul
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Bowman
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv00743
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing counsel to file with the Court a pleading certifying whether Dr. Kropac is or is not involved in this matter; should Dr. Kropac be involved, the undersigned will direct that the Clerk rotate this matter to another Magistrate Judge in the District; counsel is directed to file said pleading no later than 10/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 10/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record; parties acting pro se) (kew)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security, #2 Summons as to United States Attorney) (kew)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS The #1 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs is GRANTED; the applicant is permitted to proceed without prepayment of costs of fees or the necessity of giving security therefor; the Clerk is directed to issue the summons(es); Plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 10/17/2019. (cc: counsel of record) (kew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
October 11, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Summons submitted as to Attorney General, #2 Summons submitted as to Commissioner of Social Security, #3 Summons submitted as to United States Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Lisa Marie Bowman to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowman v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Bowman
Represented By: Wendle D. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?