Baldy v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: John T. Baldy, II
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00755
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and this case shall proceed as follows: Joinder of Parties, Plaintiff's amended pleadings due by 2/3/2020. Joinder of Parties, Defendant's amended pleadings due by 2/17/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 6/23/2020. Discovery to close by 8/7/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/8/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 7/8/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/24/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 8/27/2020. Responses due by 9/10/2020. Replies due by 9/17/2020. Settlement Meeting to be held by 10/28/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 11/4/2020, with responses due by 11/12/2020. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 11/2/2020. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 11/9/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 12/9/2020. Final Settlement Conference at 11:00 AM on 12/14/2020 in Charleston. Trial set for 12/15/2020 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/2/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, John T. Baldy, II. (Kenney, Jonathan) (Modified on 11/27/2019 to add party filer) (kew).
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Kenney, Jonathan)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/12/2019. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/21/2019. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/29/2019. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 12/5/2019 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/12/2019. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/23/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mms)
October 17, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (mms)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC with summons, complaint, answer, order setting scheduling conference, scheduling order, other miscellaneous documents and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7417746. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldy v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan M. Kenney
Represented By: Dennis Kyle Deak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Baldy, II
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: D. Christopher Hedges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?