Miller v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Plaintiff: Brian Miller
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, Life Insurance Company of North America and MRC Global (US) INC. Long-Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00793
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL as to MRC Global (US) Inc. Long-Term Disability Plan Without Prejudice by Brian Miller, MRC Global (US) Inc. Long-Term Disability Plan, Life Insurance Company of North America (Stephens, John) (Modified on 12/19/2019 to add party filers) (ts).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 1/3/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/9/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 1/16/2020. Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 1/30/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 2/6/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 12/16/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Lynch, John)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS re: #1 Complaint to 12/20/2019 by Brian Miller, Life Insurance Company of North America. (Stephens, John) (Modified on 12/4/2019 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kew).
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/15/2019 as to Life Insurance Company of North America. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002615045. (kew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 11/15/2019 as to MRC Global (US) INC. Long-Term Disability Plan. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002615038. (kew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 4, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America, MRC Global (US) INC. Long-Term Disability Plan re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons as to MRC Global (US) Inc.) (ts)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7440820. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons as to Life Insurance Company of North America, #4 Proposed Summons as to MRC Global (US) Inc.) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: John C. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRC Global (US) INC. Long-Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Miller
Represented By: John Patrick L. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?