Meeks v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Byron Meeks
Defendant: Rob McClung, Tom Joyce and Joe Martin
Case Number: 2:2019cv00846
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung in opposition #21 EXPEDITED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RESTRAINING ORDER WITH AFFIDAVIT SUPPORT by Byron Meeks (Mayo, Timothy)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 27, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the West Virginia Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00144. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 27, 2019 Case transferred to District of Southern District of West Virginia. Entire Case file electronically transmitted. (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REJECTING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (DKT. NO. #10 ), OVERRULING OBJECTIONS ([DKT. NO. 13]), AND TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF WEST VIRGINIA. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 11/27/2019. (Copy to PS Plaintiff by cert. mail). (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 21 EXPEDITED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND RESTRAINING ORDER WITH AFFIDAVIT SUPPORT by Byron Meeks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Building Enforcement Agency, #2 Exhibit 2A-2D - City of Parkersburg Documents, #3 Exhibit 3A-3E - Misc. Documents, #4 Exhibit 4A-4C - Affidavit of Calvin Kirby, #5 Exhibit 5A-5C - Affidvit of Brian Davis, #6 Exhibit 6A-6E - Misc. Documents, #7 Exhibit 7A-7E - Misc. Documents, #8 Exhibit 8A-8C - Affidavit of Charlie Kingrey, #9 Exhibit 9A-9B - Affidavit of Bernie Edmans, #10 Exhibit 10A-10B - Affidavit of Daniel Hickman, #11 Exhibit 1A-11E - EPA Documents, #12 Exhibit 12A-12I - Misc. Documents, #13 Exhibit 13A-13B - Misc. Documents, #14 Exhibit 14A-14J - Affidavit of Crystal Meeks, #15 Exhibit 15A-15F - Parkersburg Downtown Design Committee, #16 Envelope) (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Foster, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR FALSIFICATION OF EVIDENCE by Byron Meeks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 11/2/18 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - 11/2/18 Correspondence, #3 Exhibit 2A - 3/1/19 Correspondence, #4 Exhibit 2B - 11/13/18 Correspondence, #5 Exhibit 2C - City of Parkersburg document, #6 Exhibit 3 - Photograph and Auto Repair document, #7 Exhibit 3A - Misc document, #8 Exhibit 3B - Photograph, #9 Exhibit 3C - Auto repair document, #10 Exhibit 3D - Auto repair document, #11 Exhibit 3E - Photographs, #12 Exhibit 3F - Misc. document, #13 Exhibit 4A - City of Parkersburg document, #14 Exhibit 4B - Photograph, #15 Exhibit 5A - 6/14/12 Correspondence, #16 Exhibit 5B - City of Parkersburg document, #17 Exhibit 5C - Misc. document, #18 Exhibit 5D - Misc. document, #19 Exhibit 5E - Misc. document, #20 Exhibit 5F - Board of Zoning Appeals document, #21 Envelope)(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Foster, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung. (mh) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/27/2019) (mh). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO THE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Byron Meeks re #14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rule 4. Summons, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Summons in a Civil Action, #4 Certificate of Service) (No envelope - documents received at counter). (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support by Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung re #14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Foster, Jeffrey) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Tom Joyce, Joe Martin, Rob McClung. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Tom Joyce, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Joe Martin, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Michele Craig)(Foster, Jeffrey)[Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendations. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN RECEIPT as to #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/5/2019 (per USPS website). (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN RECEIPT as to #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Byron Meeks. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/8/2019 (per USPS website). (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Byron Meeks recommending that this action be transferred, pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 1404(a), to the docket of the United States District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia for all further proceedings. Any party shall, within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation, file with the Clerk of the Court specific written objections identifying the portions of the Report and Recommendation to which objection is made, and the basis for such objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 8/5/19. (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert. mail)(mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 8/3/19 (per USPS). (mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Rob McClung served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Tom Joyce served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Joe Martin served on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL of action to the Honorable Michael J. Aloi, United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Senior Judge Irene M. Keeley on 8/1/2019. (Copy to Pro Se Plaintiff by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number WVNC002661. (dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF GENERAL GUIDELINES FOR APPEARING PRO SE IN FEDERAL COURT (To Pro Se Plaintiff by cert. mail). (dk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/31/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (dk). [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Byron Meeks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dk) [Transferred from West Virginia Northern on 11/27/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeks v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob McClung
Represented By: Timothy L. Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Joyce
Represented By: Timothy L. Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Martin
Represented By: Timothy L. Mayo
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Meeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?