TransCanada USA Services, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: TransCanada USA Services, Inc.
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company and Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00896
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Zurich American Insurance Company in support of #11 MOTION by Zurich American Insurance Company to Dismiss #1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay Action. (Hoblitzell, John)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Zurich American Insurance Company to Dismiss #1 Complaint or in the Alternative Stay Action. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hoblitzell, John)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/12/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/19/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/26/2020. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 p.m. on 3/11/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/18/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/25/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 1/28/2020. (cc: counsel of record and to any unrepresented party) (mms)
January 23, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Westchester Fire Insurance Company. (Perry, Matthew) (Modified on 1/23/2020 to add jury demand) (kew).
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company has until 02/07/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint by Zurich American Insurance Company, TransCanada USA Services, Inc. (Hoblitzell, John) (Modified on 1/21/2020 to remove link to #4 stipulation and to add party filer) (kew).
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendant Westchester Fire Insurance Company has until 1/24/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 Complaint by Westchester Fire Insurance Company, TransCanada USA Services, Inc. (Perry, Matthew) (Modified on 1/10/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 12/18/2019 as to Westchester Fire Insurance Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002633711. (kew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 12/18/2019 as to Zurich American Insurance Company. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002633704. (kew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION re: extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint to 1/24/2020 by Zurich American Insurance Company, TransCanada USA Services, Inc. (Hoblitzell, John) (Modified on 1/2/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
December 13, 2019 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zurich American Insurance Company and Westchester Fire Insurance Company, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 as to Westerchester Fire Insurance Company) (mms)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7486393. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Proposed Summons as to Zurich American Insurance Company, #5 Proposed Summons as to Westchester Fire Insurance Company, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TransCanada USA Services, Inc. v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Hoblitzell, III
Represented By: Erin J. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westchester Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TransCanada USA Services, Inc.
Represented By: Mychal Sommer Schulz
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?