McGurgan v. Marks et al
Plaintiff: William McGurgan
Defendant: Charleston Police Department and Officer R. K. Marks
Case Number: 2:2020cv00140
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/31/2020. (cc: plaintiff) (ts)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION It is respectfully PROPOSED that the District Court confirm and accept the foregoing findings and RECOMMENDED that the District Court DENY Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs, DISMISS Plaintiff's #2 Complaint and remove these matters from the Court's docket. If the PF&R was served electronically, Objections are due by 4/14/2020. If the PF&R was served by mail, Objections are due by 4/17/2020. This case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/31/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER to Rory L. Perry II, from William McGurgan dated 3/16/2020, re: change of address. (lca)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by William McGurgan (pro-se) for Appointment of Counsel. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (lca)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 LETTER to William McGurgan, from Rory L. Perry II dated 2/27/2020, re: #4 letter requesting copy of Petition. (klc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER to Clerk of Court, from William McGurgan dated 2/25/2020, re: requesting copy of Petition. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Proposed Findings & Recommendations. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
February 19, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (kew)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by William McGurgan to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGurgan v. Marks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charleston Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer R. K. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William McGurgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?