Field v. State of West Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Dale P. Field, Jr.
Defendant: Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, John 1 Doe, John 2 Doe, State of West Virginia, Captain Patrice, Kelly Lantum and Betsy Jividen
Case Number: 2:2020cv00147
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Office: Charleston Office
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dale P. Field, Jr. against State of West Virginia, Betsy Jividen, Kelly Lantum, Patrice. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope) (kew)
April 3, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY by Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, State of West Virginia to #14 Response In Opposition. (Oko-ogua, Suleiman)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #15 Motion to Appoint Counsel, as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/30/2020. (cc: Plaintiff; counsel of record) (kew)
March 26, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Dale P. Field, Jr. to Appoint Counsel. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (kew)
March 26, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Dale P. Field, Jr. in opposition to #3 MOTION by Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, State of West Virginia to Dismiss Complaint. (kew)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, State of West Virginia in opposition to #8 MOTION by Dale P. Field, Jr to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County (Oko-ogua, Suleiman)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing that Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is GRANTED; Plaintiff is directed to file his Amended Complaint on or before 4/27/2020; Plaintiff is further NOTIFIED that it will be insufficient for him to simply refer to his prior Complaint, or additional documentation, or to incorporate the same by reference in the Amended Complaint and that service of process cannot be effectuated on "John Doe" or "Jane Doe" defendants; directing that #10 Motion to Appoint Guardian Ad Litem is DENIED; further directing Plaintiff's #11 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall file a Response by 5/04/2020, and the Defendants will have 7 business days within which to file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 3/19/2020. (cc: Plaintiff with enclosure; counsel of record) (ts)
March 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Dale P. Field, Jr. (pro se) to Extend Time to File Response to #3 MOTION by Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, State of West Virginia to Dismiss Complaint. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (tmr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Dale P. Field, Jr. (pro se) to Appoint Guardian ad Litem. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (tmr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION by Dale P. Field, Jr. (pro se) for Leave to File Amended Complaint Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (tmr)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Dale P. Field, Jr. (pro se) to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (tmr)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing that Plaintiff's response to the #3 Motion to Dismiss Complaint shall be filed with the Clerk by 04/03/2020; Defendants will have until 4/17/2020 to file a reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 2/26/2020. (cc: plaintiff; counsel of record) (kew)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM by Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, State of West Virginia in support of #3 MOTION by Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, State of West Virginia to Dismiss Complaint. (Oko-ogua, Suleiman)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections, State of West Virginia to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Petition for Removal. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. (Oko-ogua, Suleiman) (Modified on 2/26/2020 to add link to #1 petition for removal) (kew).
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Proposed Findings & Recommendations. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
February 20, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION OF REMOVAL by State of West Virginia, Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7549219. (Attachments: #1 State Courts Documents, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Receipt for Filing Fee, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Field v. State of West Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale P. Field, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Rehabilitation and Corrections
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: Suleiman O. Oko-ogua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 2 Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of West Virginia
Represented By: John P. Fuller
Represented By: Suleiman O. Oko-ogua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Patrice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Lantum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betsy Jividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?