Shinault v. Comenity Bank
Plaintiff: Amanda Shinault
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Case Number: 2:2020cv00251
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/6/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/17/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/24/2020. Scheduling Conference at 1:30 p.m. on 8/28/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/8/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/15/2020. Signed by Senior District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 5/18/2020. (cc: counsel of record and to any unrepresented parties) (mms)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Comenity Bank, Amanda Shinault. (Manley, Reid) (Modified on 5/13/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING #1 Complaint to 5/13/2020 by Comenity Bank, Amanda Shinault. (Manley, Reid) (Modified on 5/7/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 4/15/2020 as to Comenity Bank. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100002701809. (klc) (Modified on 4/24/2020 to update filing date) (ts).
April 13, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Comenity Bank, re: #1 Complaint. ERROR: Unflattened image attached. CORRECTION: Image flattened and replaced. (ts)
April 9, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
April 8, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Comenity Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mms) (Modified on 4/13/2020 to replace image) (ts).
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7591111. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Comenity Bank, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shinault v. Comenity Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Shinault
Represented By: Benjamin Sheridan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comenity Bank
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?