6515 MacCorkle, LLC v. Evanston Insurance Company
Plaintiff: 6515 MacCorkle, LLC
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00253
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 5/27/2020 is cancelled and the case shall proceed as follows. Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 6/26/2020. Discovery requests to be completed by 10/2/2020, and all depositions by 11/27/2020. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 9/4/2020, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 10/2/2020, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 10/16/2020. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 12/18/2020. Motions in Limine to be filed by 3/19/2021, with responses due by 3/26/2021. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 4/21/2021. Proposed integrated pretrial order due by 4/28/2021. Proposed Jury Charges due by 4/26/2021. A combined Pretrial Conference/Settlement Conference is set for 5/5/2021 at 11:00 am. Jury Trial is set for 5/17/2021 at 9:00 AM in Charleston before Judge Irene C. Berger. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 5/14/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Evanston Insurance Company, 6515 MacCorkle, LLC. (Walling, Sarah) (Modified on 5/14/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Evanston Insurance Company. (Hall, Lee)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 4/29/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/6/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 5/13/2020. Scheduling Conference at 3:30 p.m. on 5/27/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 6/3/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 6/10/2020. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/10/2020. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (mms)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
April 8, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Evanston Insurance Company with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7591569. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 6515 MacCorkle, LLC v. Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Lee Murray Hall
Represented By: Kevin Kidd
Represented By: Sarah A. Walling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 6515 MacCorkle, LLC
Represented By: James A. Meade
Represented By: Charles S. Piccirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?