Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company v. Cooper
Petitioner: Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company
Respondent: James Skylar Cooper
Case Number: 2:2020cv00321
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for James Skylar Cooper, James Skylar Cooper served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (Perry, Matthew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Skylar Cooper, re: #1 Petition for Declaratory Judgment. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company for James Skylar Cooper, re: #1 Petition for Declaratory Judgment. (Perry, Matthew) (Modified on 6/12/2020 to add link to #1 petition) (kew).
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
May 7, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7612379. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company v. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erie Insurance Property & Casualty Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Perry
Represented By: James D. Lamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Skylar Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?