Wojciehowicz v. The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Plaintiff: David Wojciehowicz
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00355
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND ANSWER DATE re: #1 Complaint to 7/22/2020 by The Chemours Company FC, LLC, David Wojciehowicz. (Thompson, Chelsea) (Modified on 6/12/2020 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filer) (kew).
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED BY SECRETARY OF STATE re: #1 Complaint as to The Chemours Company FC, LLC ; answer due 6/22/2020. (tmr)
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
May 21, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Chemours Company FC, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (st)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7623102. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to The Chemours Company FC, LLC) (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wojciehowicz v. The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wojciehowicz
Represented By: Sean W. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?