Hedrick v. Saul
Plaintiff: Hope Hedrick
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00449
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 SET ANSWER DEADLINE as to Andrew Saul for 9/18/2020. (ts)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Hope Marie Hedrick for service upon Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Andrew Saul served on 7/20/2020, answer due 9/18/2020. Person Served: U.S. Attorney SDWV, V. Dickerson. Return Receipt Card for Attorney General signed on 7/20/2020. Return Receipt Card for Commissioner of Social Security signed on 7/20/2020. (Gillikin, Robert) (Modified on 8/20/2020 to convert event to summons returned, executed in a social security case and to set answer date)(ts).
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. Summons returnable 60 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (msa)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS directing that the #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs is GRANTED; the Clerk shall issue the summons(es); Plaintiff shall serve the summons(es) and complaint pursuant to Rule 4, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 7/1/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (msa)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
June 30, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to United States Attorney for the Southern District of WV, #3 Proposed Summons as to Attorney General of the United States, #4 Proposed Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security) (st)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Hope Hedrick to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (st)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hedrick v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Hedrick
Represented By: Robert W. Gillikin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?