Estep v. Saul
Plaintiff: Justin Wayne Estep
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00476
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States Marshal for United States Attorney re: #6 Summons Issued as to USA. United States Attorney served on 8/4/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. Person Served: Michelle Wallace. (arb)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Commissioner of Social Security re: #2 Complaint on 8/10/2020. (lca)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from Attorney General re: #2 Complaint on 8/10/2020. (lca)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Justin Wayne Estep for Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 60 days. Original Summons and 1 copy mailed to USM for service. (Attachment: #1 Form USM-285 (3)) (arb)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS: The #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall issue the summons(es) and the United States Marshal's Service shall serve the summons(es) and complaint. The recovery if any, obtained in this action shall be paid to the Clerk of the Court, who shall pay therefrom all unpaid costs taxed against plaintiff and pay the balance to the plaintiff and plaintiff's attorney, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/17/2020. (cc: Plaintiff, pro se, counsel of record and USM) (arb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Justin Wayne Estep for Andrew Saul, re: #2 Complaint. (jsa)
July 13, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT. (jsa)
July 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Justin Wayne Estep to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. (jsa) (Modified on 7/16/2020 to correct party filer) (ts).
July 13, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estep v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nora R. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Wayne Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?