Plauche v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Rob M. Plauche
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00485
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISMISSAL ORDER directing that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the Clerk is directed to remove this case from this Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED ORDER Final Dismissal Order by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Rob M. Plauche. (Parsons, Colton) (Modified on 9/2/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Parsons, Colton)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 8/11/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 8/25/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/1/2020. Scheduling Conference at 03:30 PM on 9/8/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 9/14/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 9/22/2020 Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 7/21/2020. (cc:counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 17, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Wood County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7678560. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plauche v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rob M. Plauche
Represented By: Jay W. Gerber
Represented By: Bruce M. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Colton Chase Parsons
Represented By: Monte L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?