Rockwell Mining, LLC et al v. Pocahontas Land LLC
Plaintiff: Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC and Rockwell Mining, LLC
Defendant: Pocahontas Land LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00487
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC (Hayes, Seth)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Rockwell Mining, LLC (Hayes, Seth)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S #1 COMPLAINT to 9/17/2020 by Pocahontas Land LLC, Rockwell Mining, LLC, Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC. (Adkins, J.) (Modified on 8/12/2020 to add link to #1 complaint and to add party filers) (kew).
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REISSUED by the Clerk via Certified Mail, Restricted Delivery on behalf of Rockwell Mining, LLC, Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC for Pocahontas Land LLC, re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. (Attachment: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (kew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 LETTER TO CLERK from Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC, Rockwell Mining, LLC requesting issuance of Summons and Complaint via certified mail, restricted delivery. (kew)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 17, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Pocahontas Land LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (lca)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7679024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockwell Mining, LLC et al v. Pocahontas Land LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pocahontas Land LLC
Represented By: J. Mark Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackhawk Land and Resources, LLC
Represented By: Seth Patrick Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell Mining, LLC
Represented By: Seth Patrick Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?