Bigley v. Jenkins
Plaintiff: Kelly Renee Bigley
Defendant: Dr. Janet Jenkins
Case Number: 2:2020cv00510
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS filed in the Circuit Court of Kanawha County. (ts)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY by Janet Jenkins to #3 MOTION by Janet Jenkins to Dismiss Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ford, Joseph)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file any response to the #3 motion to dismiss by 8/14/2020; Defendant is directed to file any reply by 8/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 7/30/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Janet Jenkins in support of #3 MOTION by Janet Jenkins to Dismiss Complaint. (Ford, Joseph)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION by Janet Jenkins to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (Ford, Joseph) (Modified on 7/30/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dr. Janet Jenkins with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7687748. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)
July 27, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigley v. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Renee Bigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Janet Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph A. Ford
Represented By: H. Dill Battle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?