Monaco v. WV Parkways Authority
Plaintiff: Blazine Monaco
Defendant: WV Parkways Authority
Case Number: 2:2020cv00517
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME re: #17 MOTION by WV Parkways Authority to Dismiss #1 Complaint to October 19, 2020 by Blazine Monaco (Fiorelli, Nicole)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 10/14/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/26/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/2/2020. Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 11/16/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/23/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/23/2020. (cc:counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (btm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by WV Parkways Authority in support of #17 MOTION by WV Parkways Authority to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (McMillan, Stuart)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION by WV Parkways Authority to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (McMillan, Stuart)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING SERVICE OF PROCESS by WV Parkways Authority, Blazine Monaco. (McMillan, Stuart) (Modified on 9/21/2020 to add party filer) (kew).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER The #11 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default is GRANTED; the #9 Entry of Default against Defendant is SET ASIDE; Defendant is permitted to file a responsive pleading within 21 days of this Order, or within twenty-one 21 days of service, should it be determined by either of the parties or the court that service has not yet been accomplished; the #14 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/17/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by WV Parkways Authority for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum of Law. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, Stuart)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received re: #9 Clerk's Entry of Default as to WV Parkways Authority. (ts)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by WV Parkways Authority in support of #11 MOTION by WV Parkways Authority to Set Aside #9 Clerk's Entry of Default. (McMillan, Stuart)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by WV Parkways Authority to Set Aside #9 Clerk's Entry of Default. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(McMillan, Stuart)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart A. McMillan, Peter G. Markham on behalf of WV Parkways Authority. (McMillan, Stuart)
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 SET ASIDE PURSUANT TO #15 ORDER: CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to WV Parkways Authority pursuant to Rule 55(a), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachment: #1 Certified Mail Receipt) (cc: counsel of record; defendant via certified mail) (ts) (Modified on 9/17/2020 to note default set aside per #15 order) (ts).
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against the defendant WV Parkways Authority; further directing counsel for the plaintiff to file the appropriate motion and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/2/2020. (cc: counsel of record; defendant) (ts)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for WV Parkways Authority, WV Parkways Authority served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Skinner, Stephen)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Patrick J. Perotti on behalf of Blazine Monaco. Local counsel: Stephen G. Skinner. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7697281. (Skinner, Stephen)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Nicole T. Fiorelli on behalf of Blazine Monaco. Local counsel: Stephen G. Skinner. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7697271. (Skinner, Stephen)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Frank A. Bartela on behalf of Blazine Monaco. Local counsel: Stephen G. Skinner. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7697257. (Skinner, Stephen)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
July 30, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to WV Parkways Authority re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (ts)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7691386. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monaco v. WV Parkways Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WV Parkways Authority
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: Peter G. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blazine Monaco
Represented By: Stephen G. Skinner
Represented By: Patrick J. Perotti
Represented By: Frank A. Bartela
Represented By: Nicole T. Fiorelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?