Barnett v. Walden et al
Plaintiff: Helena Barnett
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company, Rebekah Bisnett and Amy Beth Walden
Case Number: 2:2020cv00549
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL directing that this civil action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and retired from the docket of the Court. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 9/24/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Dismissal Order by Allstate Insurance Company (Kesner, Tanya)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ELECTION TO DEFEND AND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Tanya M. Kesner on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company, Rebekah Bisnett. (Kesner, Tanya) (Modified on 8/21/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal, to add jury demand and to convert event to amended answer to complaint) (kew).
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ELECTION TO DEFEND AND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Tanya M. Kesner on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company, Rebekah Bisnett. (Kesner, Tanya) (Modified on 8/21/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal, to add jury demand and to convert event to amended answer to complaint) (kew).
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ELECTION TO DEFEND AND ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Tanya M. Kesner on behalf of Allstate Insurance Company, Rebekah Bisnett. (Kesner, Tanya) (Modified on 8/21/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal, to add jury demand and to convert event to answer to complaint) (kew).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/14/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/28/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/5/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 10/9/2020. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/12/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/19/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 8/21/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORDS from the Circuit Court of Logan County. Includes: Supplement to Exhibit attached to Notice of Removal (Kesner, Tanya)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 19, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rebekah Bisnett, Allstate Insurance Company with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Logan County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7710933. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnett v. Walden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark L. Garren
Represented By: Tanya M. Kesner
Represented By: Kermit J. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Bisnett
Represented By: Mark L. Garren
Represented By: Tanya M. Kesner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Beth Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Barnett
Represented By: Gregory B. Chiartas
Represented By: Robert M. Ilderton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?