Jeffery et al v. ERP Federal Mining Complex LLC
Plaintiff: United Mine Workers of America International Union and Norman R. Jeffery, Jr.
Defendant: ERP Federal Mining Complex LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00556
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from T.J. Baker on behalf of United Mine Workers of America International Union, Norman R. Jeffery, Jr. Local counsel: Kevin Fagan. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7747498. (Baker, Timothy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for ERP Federal Mining Complex LLC, ERP Federal Mining Complex LLC served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Baker, Timothy)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 21, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ERP Federal Mining Complex, LLC and ERP Federal Mining Complex, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to ERP Federal Mining Complex, LLC c/o Corporation Service Company) (mms)
August 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7713255. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffery et al v. ERP Federal Mining Complex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERP Federal Mining Complex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Mine Workers of America International Union
Represented By: Kevin F. Fagan
Represented By: Timothy J. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman R. Jeffery, Jr.
Represented By: Kevin F. Fagan
Represented By: Timothy J. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?