Boykin v. Belcher et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Ray Boykin
Defendant: Dustin Caruthers, Zachary Belcher and Justin Hicks
Case Number: 2:2020cv00560
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Referring Judge: Dwane L Tinsley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED BY U. S. MARSHAL as to Justin Hicks re: #2 Complaint. Returned unexecuted on 9/24/2020. (tmr)
October 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED BY U. S. MARSHAL as to Zachary Belcher re: #2 Complaint. Returned unexecuted on 9/24/2020. (tmr)
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by U. S. Marshal for service upon Dustin Caruthers, re: #2 Complaint. Dustin Caruthers served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. Person Served: Dustin Caruthers, Correctional Officer. (tmr)
October 6, 2020 Filing 7 Partial Filing Fee Received: $18.85, Receipt Number CHAR018135. (mms)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 Partial Filing Fee Received: $9.11, Receipt Number CHAR018135. (mms)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk for Zachary Belcher, Dustin Caruthers, Justin Hicks, re: #2 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 1 copy delivered to USM for service. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Caruthers, #2 Summons as to Belcher, #3 USM Forms for each defendant) (ts)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing that the plaintiff shall pay the full amount of filing fee of $350.00 by payments sent to the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to his prisoner's account. Granting #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Further directing that the United States Marshals Service shall personally serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on each defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 8/26/2020. (cc: plaintiff; Trustee Clerk at the Northern Correctional Center; any unrepresented party) (lca)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 24, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 VERIFIED COMPLAINT. (ts)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Johnny Ray Boykin to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees or Costs (Attachment: #1 Resident Transaction Details) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boykin v. Belcher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Caruthers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Belcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Ray Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?