Brown et al v. Superior Pocahontas, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bulldog Excavating, LLC and Aaron D. Brown
Defendant: Superior Pocahontas, LLC, Marion Hensley and Mark Hatcher
Case Number: 2:2020cv00572
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 14 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Aaron D. Brown, Bulldog Excavating, LLC. (Stanley, Jonathon)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Bulldog Excavating, LLC. (Stanley, Jonathon) (Modified on 9/29/2020 to remove party filer) (kew).
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Superior Pocahontas, LLC. (Konrad, Daniel) (Modified on 9/24/2020 to remove party filers) (kew).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions due by 10/14/2020. Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting is 10/26/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 11/2/2020. Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 11/16/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order by 11/23/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/23/2020. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented parties) (arb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint by Mark Hatcher, Marion Hensley, Superior Pocahontas, LLC.(Konrad, Daniel)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Superior Pocahontas, LLC, Superior Pocahontas, LLC served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Stanley, Jonathon)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Marion Hensley, Marion Hensley served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Stanley, Jonathon)
September 17, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Mark Hatcher, Mark Hatcher served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Stanley, Jonathon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Hatcher, Marion Hensley, Superior Pocahontas, LLC, re: #1 Verified Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Mark Hatcher, #2 Summons as to Superior Pocahontas, LLC) (kew)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Bulldog Excavating, LLC, Aaron D. Brown for Superior Pocahontas, LLC, re: #1 Verified Complaint. (Stanley, Jonathon) (Modified on 9/2/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Bulldog Excavating, LLC, Aaron D. Brown for Mark Hatcher, re: #1 Verified Complaint. (Stanley, Jonathon) (Modified on 9/2/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Bulldog Excavating, LLC, Aaron D. Brown for Marion Hensley, re: #1 Verified Complaint. (Stanley, Jonathon) (Modified on 9/2/2020 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7721560. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B continued, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)
August 28, 2020 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Superior Pocahontas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bulldog Excavating, LLC
Represented By: Kent J. George
Represented By: Stephen D. Annand
Represented By: Jonathon Craig Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron D. Brown
Represented By: Kent J. George
Represented By: Stephen D. Annand
Represented By: Jonathon Craig Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Pocahontas, LLC
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Hensley
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hatcher
Represented By: Daniel J. Konrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?