Myricks v. United States of America
Petitioner: Bari Myricks
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00631
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Referring Judge: Cheryl A Eifert
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 52 Document filed only in criminal case; not applicable to this proceeding. (slr)
November 3, 2020 Filing 51 Document filed only in criminal case; not applicable to this proceeding. (slr)
October 21, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Andrew J. Tessman appearing on behalf of United States of America. (Tessman, Andrew)
October 1, 2020 Filing 49 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF 2255 MOTION by Bari Myricks to U. S. Attorney with copy to Movant, Judge and Magistrate Judge. (tmr)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER as to Bari Myricks; directing the United States to respond to the #46 MOTION by Bari Myricks to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255 within 60 days of the entry of this order. If Movant's claims involve plea or sentencing issues then the United States is directed to file the plea hearing and/or sentencing hearing transcripts. Movant may file a reply to the answer of the United States within 60 days after service of the answer by the United States. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 9/30/2020. (cc: USA; movant) (lca)
September 29, 2020 Filing 47 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: Judge Copenhaver; Magistrate Judge Eifert; Petitioner; USA; USM; USP) Cross Reference Criminal Number 2:19-cr-00225. (klc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION by Bari Myricks to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by a Person in Federal Custody pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2255. Cross Reference Criminal Case Number 2:19-cr-225. (tmr) (Modified document number to conform to companion criminal case on 9/24/2020) (slr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myricks v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bari Myricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Andrew J. Tessman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?