Mason v. Santiago et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Mason
Defendant: Captain Brian Penick, Correctional Officer Skylar Santiago, Correctional Officer Johnnie Wilson and Correctional Officer John Blankenship
Case Number: 2:2020cv00693
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Blankenship, Brian Penick, Skylar Santiago, Johnnie Wilson for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Daniel Lee Mason. (Murray, William)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that the case shall proceed as follows. Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 1/11/2021. Discovery requests to be completed by 6/15/2021, and all depositions by 7/30/2021. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 6/1/2021, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 6/30/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 7/16/2021. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 8/19/2021. Responses due by 9/2/2021. Replies due by 9/9/2021. Settlement Meeting to be held by 10/20/2021. Motions in Limine to be filed by 10/27/2021, with responses due by 11/3/2021. Plaintiffs portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendants due by 10/25/2021. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 11/1/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2021 at 11:00 AM in Charleston before Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Proposed Jury Charges due by 11/30/2021. Final Settlement Conference at 10:00 AM on 12/6/2021 in Charleston. Trial set for 12/7/2021 at 9:30 AM in Charleston before Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 12/1/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
November 30, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by John Blankenship, Brian Penick, Skylar Santiago, Johnnie Wilson, Daniel Mason. (Murray, William) (Modified on 12/1/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL, With Jury Demand by Skylar Santiago.(Murray, William) (Modified on 11/19/2020 to add jury demand) (ts).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 11/18/2020. Rule 26(f) Meeting 11/30/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 12/7/2020. Scheduling Conference at 09:30 AM on 12/11/2020 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 12/21/2020. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 12/28/2020 Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 10/29/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mk)
October 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand by John Blankenship, Brian Penick, Johnnie Wilson.(Murray, William) (Modified on 10/28/2020 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add jury demand) (ts).
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
October 21, 2020 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brian Penick, John Blankenship, Johnnie Wilson with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7777345. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. Santiago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Brian Penick
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Skylar Santiago
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Johnnie Wilson
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer John Blankenship
Represented By: William E. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Mason
Represented By: Paul E. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?