Linville et al v. American Income Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gladys P. Linville and Jerry L. Linville
Defendant: American Income Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00726
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER The Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 12/28/2020 is CANCELED and directing this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 1/27/2021. The parties shall serve all discovery requests by 6/4/2021, and discovery to close on 7/19/2021. Expert Witness List by the party bearing the burden of proof due no later than 5/19/2021, by the party not bearing the burden of proof due no later than 6/21/2021, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due no later than 7/6/2021. All dispositive motions, except those filed under Rule 12(b), shall be filed and served by 8/9/2021, with responses due by 8/23/2021, and replies due by 8/30/2021. Settlement Meeting to be held no later than 10/11/2021. All motions in limine shall be filed and served by 10/18/2021, with responses due by 10/25/2021. The plaintiff portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 10/13/2021, and the proposed integrated pretrial order due for entry no later than 10/20/2021. A pretrial conference shall be held at 9:00 AM on 11/17/2021. Proposed charges to the jury due by 11/23/2021. A final settlement conference shall be held at 9:00 AM on 11/17/2021. Trial of this action shall be held at 9:00 AM on 11/30/2021 before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/3/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #5 Counterclaim by Gladys P. Linville, Jerry L. Linville.(Polak, John) (Modified on 12/3/2020 to add party filer) (ts).
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by American Income Life Insurance Company, Jerry L. Linville, Gladys P. Linville. (Attachment: #1 Supplement Rule 26(f) Worksheet)(Kesner, Brent) (Modified on 12/2/2020 to add party filers) (ts).
November 11, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by American Income Life Insurance Company, with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Relief by Defendant American Income Life Insurance Company against Plaintiffs Gladys P. Linville, Jerry L. Linville.(Kesner, Brent) (Modified on 11/12/2020 to add jury demand)(ts).
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant American Income Life Insurance Company (Kesner, Brent)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions due by 11/30/2020. Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting is 12/14/2020. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting is 12/21/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 02:00 PM on 12/28/2020 in Charleston before the undersigned. Entry of Scheduling Order by 1/4/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures is 1/11/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/9/2020. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
November 6, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 5, 2020 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Income Life Insurance Company with summons, complaint, miscellaneous document and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Boone County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7793823. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 2, 3, 4 #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linville et al v. American Income Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys P. Linville
Represented By: John J. Polak
Represented By: Matthew M. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Linville
Represented By: John J. Polak
Represented By: Matthew M. Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Income Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent K. Kesner
Represented By: Barbara J. Keefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?