Plaintiff v. Defendant
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Defendant: Defendant
Case Number: 2:2020cv11111
Filed: January 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Nature of Suit: Shell Case Opening
Cause of Action: 77:7777
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 356 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Marietta Area Healthcare, Inc. v. Michael A. King, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7749541. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hissam, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2020: #2 Complaint), #3 Summons as to Michael King) (ts). CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00639 (ts).
September 24, 2020 Filing 355 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Malay v. Virtuoso Sourcing Group, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7748243. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mize, Joshua) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00635 (ts).
September 24, 2020 Filing 354 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Selma Long v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7747871. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Proctor, Jason) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00634 (ts).
September 24, 2020 Filing 353 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Paula Tomlin v. Wexford Health Services, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7747813. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Brown, Johnnie) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00633 (ts).
September 24, 2020 Filing 352 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. CSX Transportation v. South Fork Coal Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7747385. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (South Fork Coal Company, LLC))(Palumbo, Corey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00632 (ts).
September 24, 2020 Filing 351 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Kitts v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-630 (ts).
September 23, 2020 Filing 350 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Crum v. CSX Transportation, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7746600. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet)(Bird, Melissa) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00629 (ts).
September 23, 2020 Filing 349 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Marcum v. Bailey Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7746107. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Parsons, Colton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00628 (ts).
September 23, 2020 Filing 348 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 9/23/2020 to remove images filed relating to case #2:20-cv-00627 and refiled therein by counsel) (ts).
September 23, 2020 Filing 347 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 9/23/2020 to remove images filed relating to case #2:20-cv-00627 and refiled therein by counsel) (ts).
September 23, 2020 Filing 346 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 9/23/2020 to remove images filed relating to case #2:20-cv-00627 and refiled therein by counsel) (ts).
September 23, 2020 Filing 345 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Paul Scott v. Cracker Barrel Old Country Store, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7745905. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A (State Court Docket Sheet and documents), #3 Exhibit B (Consent of Sean Cross))(Russo, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00627 (ts).
September 23, 2020 Filing 344 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 9/23/2020 to remove images incorrectly filed in WVSD)(ts).
September 22, 2020 Filing 343 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Watts v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 Proposed IFP Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00624 (ts).
September 22, 2020 Filing 342 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Messer v. Corporal John Blankenship, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7745093. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00623 (ts).
September 22, 2020 Filing 341 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Mattingly v. Sneed Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7744878. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Fuller, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00622 (ts).
September 22, 2020 Filing 340 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Black v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00621 (ts).
September 21, 2020 Filing 339 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. McCoy v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00618 (ts).
September 18, 2020 Filing 338 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hannah v. Mullins Family Funeral Home, LLC and Joseph Mullins Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7742069. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Persinger, Howard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00617 (ts).
September 17, 2020 Filing 337 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Bill Baumgardner, et al. vs. Bob Evans Restaurant, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7740826. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Case Docket, #2 State Court Summons and Complaint)(Maher, Kristine) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00615 (ts).
September 17, 2020 Filing 336 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Wriston v. West Virginia Department of Health and Human Resources, a West Virginia State Agency, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7740768. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Hewitt, Greg) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00614 (ts).
September 15, 2020 Filing 335 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. White v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7738413. (Attachment: #1 summons)(Cook, Wendle) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00609 (ts).
September 15, 2020 Filing 334 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Denholm v. AWP, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Charge in NLRB Case 06-CA-252223, #2 Exhibit 2 Amended Charge in NLRB Case 06-CA-252223, #3 Exhibit 3 Charge in NLRB Case 06-CA-253078, #4 Exhibit 4 NLRB Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 Respondent 2-5-20 Position Statement, #6 Exhibit 6 Mosteller Affidavit - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 7 McCray Affidavit - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8 Jolley Affidavit - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9 French Affidavit - Redacted, #10 Exhibit 10 Adkins Affidavit - Redacted, #11 Exhibit 11 Cooper Affidavit, #12 Exhibit 12 Respondent's List of Disciplinary Actions, #13 Exhibit 13 Thompson Affidavit, #14 Exhibit 14 Audio Recording of 10-16-19 Meeting (Place Holder), #15 Exhibit 15 Transcript of 10-16-19 Meeting, #16 Exhibit 16 NLRB Tally of Ballots, #17 Exhibit 17 Employee Hickman Discipline, #18 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Petition, #19 Proposed Order To Show Cause, #20 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction, #21 Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Certificate of Service)(Duffey, Jonathan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00608 (ts).
September 15, 2020 Filing 333 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Zulauf v. Marshall University Board of Governors Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7738153. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons)(Cook, Sean) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00607 (ts).
September 14, 2020 Filing 332 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Eliis v. Hartford Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7737233. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stephens, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00605 (ts).
September 14, 2020 Filing 331 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Deere Credit Services, Inc. v. Davis Contracting & Excavating LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7736921. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons (corporate defendant), #4 Summons (individual defendant))(Sorrells, W.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00604 (ts).
September 11, 2020 Filing 330 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. M.T. Bores, LLC v. Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7735638. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Capito, Katherine) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00602 (klc).
September 10, 2020 Filing 329 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 9/10/2020 to remove disclosure statement incorrectly filed in the shell case) (ts).
September 10, 2020 Filing 328 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Wallace v. Par Mar Oil Company Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7733801. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Strogen, Chandler) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00590 (ts). (Additional attachment added on 9/10/2020: #7 Disclosure Statement) (ts).
September 10, 2020 Filing 327 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Moran v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7733564. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00589 (ts).
September 10, 2020 Filing 326 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Workman v. Farmer, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7733424. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00588 (ts).
September 9, 2020 Filing 325 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Longanacre v. National Council on Compensation Insurance, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7732917. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Miller, Kameron) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00587 (ts).
September 8, 2020 Filing 324 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Nelson v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 Proposed IFP Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00586 (ts).
September 8, 2020 Filing 323 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Shull v. Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # CWVSDC-7731275. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eves, Timothy) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00585 (ts).
September 8, 2020 Filing 322 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Bradford v. Genworth Life Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7731196. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hayes, Laura) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00584 (ts).
September 8, 2020 Filing 321 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Warner v. Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7730678. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00580 (ts).
September 2, 2020 Filing 320 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Catron v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00576 (ts).
August 28, 2020 Filing 319 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Brown v. Superior Pocahontas Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7721560. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B (cont.))(Stanley, Jonathon)CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00572 (ts).
August 28, 2020 Filing 318 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Eldred v. Shield Roofing and Construction Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7721441. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Proposed Summons)(Yon, Daniel) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00571 (ts).
August 28, 2020 Filing 317 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kanye West v. Mac Warner Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7721095. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Adkins, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/28/2020: #4 Verification, #5 Summons (WV Atty Gen)) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00570 (ts).
August 28, 2020 Filing 316 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Coffey v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Attorney Contract, #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment, #4 Proposed Order)(Mani, Jonathan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00568 (ts).
August 27, 2020 Filing 315 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Mills v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Social Security Case, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00567(ts).
August 27, 2020 Filing 314 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Dean vs. Saul Commissioner of SSA Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7719894. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00566 (ts)
August 26, 2020 Filing 313 CASE OPENING DOCUMENT FOR A MISCELLANEOUS CASE WITH FEE PAID - Temporary Restraining Order. Oakley v. Mac Warner et. al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #CHAR17954 . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit)(Fuqua, Cameron) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00562 (ts). (Refunded $47 fee, receipt #BWVSDC-7717314)
August 25, 2020 Filing 312 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Means v. Peterson, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7717038. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendant Peterson, #2 Summons for Defendant Harvey, #3 Summons for Defendant South Charleston)(McLaughlin, Alexander) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00561 (ts).
August 21, 2020 Filing 311 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Gibson v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet , #3 Summons, #4 Appeal Counsel Decision)(Coffman, Melissa) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00559 (ts).
August 21, 2020 Filing 310 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Stringer v. Compass Group USA, Inc. d/b/a Canteen Vending Services Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # CWVSDC-7713501. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1- State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2- State Court Notice of Removal)(Vance, Travis) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00558 (lca)
August 21, 2020 Filing 309 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. William Hackman v. The Chemours Company Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7713521. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons: Chemours Company)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00557 (lca).
August 21, 2020 Filing 308 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Jeffery, et al. v. ERP Federal Mining Complex, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7713255. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Fagan, Kevin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00556 (lca)
August 20, 2020 Filing 307 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Jennifer Short, et al v. WV Division of Corrections Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7712091. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Circuit Court Pleadings)(Oxley, Perry) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00552 (ts).
August 19, 2020 Filing 306 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Taylor v. Charleston Area Medical Center, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7711199. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00551 (ts).
August 19, 2020 Filing 305 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Auvil v. Lincoln Life Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7711117. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polak, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00550 (ts)
August 19, 2020 Filing 304 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Barnett v. Walden Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7710933. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint)(Kesner, Tanya) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00549 (ts).
August 19, 2020 Filing 303 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 8/19/2020 to remove image; counsel contacted to refile using proper event and to include circuit court documents) (ts).
August 17, 2020 Filing 302 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Massie vs Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 App proceed without payment)(Hicks, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00545 (ts).
August 14, 2020 Filing 301 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Barcus v. Koppers Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7706323. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Johnson, Andrea) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00543 (ts).
August 13, 2020 Filing 300 CASE OPENING DOCUMENT FOR A MISCELLANEOUS CASE WITH FEE PAID. Southern Coal Corporation v. BrickStreet Mutual Insurance Company Filing Fee $47.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7705295. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Franks, Raymond) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-mc-00129 (ts).
August 13, 2020 Filing 299 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Dillard v. Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7705224. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00541 (ts).
August 13, 2020 Filing 298 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Allied Insurance v. Professional Fire Extinguishers Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7705031. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Warder, Zachary) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00540 (ts).
August 12, 2020 Filing 297 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. White v. The Huntington National Bank Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7703902. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Rice, Jill) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00539 (ts).
August 11, 2020 Filing 296 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Robertson v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Application Proceed without Prepayment)(Hicks, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00538 (ts).
August 10, 2020 Filing 295 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Lovejoy v. Jackson Resources Co Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7701139. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Callaghan, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00537 (ts).
August 10, 2020 Filing 294 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Parent vs. Dejoy Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7700668. (Chittum, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00535 (ts).
August 7, 2020 Filing 293 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Holley v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00534 (ts).
August 7, 2020 Filing 292 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Arthur v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00532 (ts).
August 7, 2020 Filing 291 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Nicholas v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Forma Pauparis, #2 Proposed Summons WV Atty General, #3 Proposed Summons US Atty General, #4 Proposed Summons Comm of SSA, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boggs, Thomas) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00531 (ts).
August 6, 2020 Filing 290 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Flesher v.Village of Barboursville Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7698393. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Atkinson, John-Mark) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00530 (ts).
August 6, 2020 Filing 289 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Laborers' v. Overcash Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7698121. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for company, #3 Summons for Margo Overcash, #4 Summons for Martin Overcash)(Williams, Roger) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00529 (ts).
August 4, 2020 Filing 288 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Wilson v. Justice, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7695980. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Balenovich, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00526 (ts).
August 4, 2020 Filing 287 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. International Union v. Caleffie. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7695787. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lowry, Lawrence) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00525 (ts).
August 4, 2020 Filing 286 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Perdue v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00524 (ts).
August 3, 2020 Filing 285 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Clayborn v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7694488. (Attachment: #1 Summons)(McQueen, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts). (Modified on 8/3/2020 to replace main image with signed version and add civil cover sheet) (ts). CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00523(ts)
August 3, 2020 Filing 284 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Brumfield v. Medtronic, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7694471. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 14a, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Berthold, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-522 (ts).
July 31, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Null v. Abdella Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7692399. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Garren, Mark) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00519 (ts).
July 30, 2020 Filing 282 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kovich v. Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7691912. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kesner, Brent) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00518 (ts).
July 30, 2020 Filing 281 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Monaco v. WV Toll Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7691386. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Skinner, Stephen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00517 (ts).
July 29, 2020 Filing 280 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Defendant (Trent, Woody) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00515 (ts).
July 29, 2020 Filing 279 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Davis v. Leonard Aluminum Utility Buildings, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7690566. (Trent, Woody) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00515 (ts).
July 28, 2020 Filing 278 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. The First State Bank v. John B. Montanez, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 - Part 1, #8 Exhibit 6 - Part 2, #9 Exhibit 6 - Part 3)(Bailey, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-512 (ts).
July 28, 2020 Filing 277 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Centimark v. Travelers Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7688936. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS, #3 SUMMONS, #4 SUMMONS, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6)(Cessar, Scott) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00511 (ts).
July 27, 2020 Filing 276 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Kelly Renee Bigley v. Janet Jenkins, M.D. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7687748. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Ex. A, #3 Ex. B, #4 Ex. C, #5 Ex. D)(Ford, Joseph) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00510 (ts).
July 26, 2020 Filing 275 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Wahoowa v Consol Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7686533. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons)(St Clair, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00508 (ts).
July 24, 2020 Filing 274 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Cabell v CMH Homes Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7686201. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Stemple, Jason) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00507(ts).
July 24, 2020 Filing 273 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dawson v. Wal-Mart Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7685897. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Noel, Heather) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00506 (ts).
July 22, 2020 Filing 272 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Clark v HHC River Park, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7683513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Capito, Katherine) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00497 (ts).
July 20, 2020 Filing 271 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Portfolio Advisors v. Bluestone Resources Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7681356. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Verification, #3 Master Lease Agreement, #4 Lease Schedule No. 1, #5 Notice and Acknowledgement of Assignment, #6 UCC Financing Statement, #7 UCC Financing Statement Amendment, #8 UCC Financing Statement Amendment, #9 Notice of Default)(Adkins, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00493 (ts).
July 20, 2020 Filing 270 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dameron v. McKesson Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7681187. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Jessee, Russell) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00492 (ts).
July 17, 2020 Filing 269 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Maranda Webb and Jeremy Webb v. Ethicon, Inc and Johnson & Johnson Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7679187. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Willis, Damon) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00489 (ts).
July 17, 2020 Filing 268 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. John Richardson, et al. v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7679069. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Kansas Business Entity Search, #3 Exhibit B - Better Business Bureau - Corinthian Mortgage Corp, #4 Exhibit C - WV Secretary of State Defendant Detail - Corinthian Mortgage Corp, #5 Exhibit D - Pleadings and Other Relevant Documents, #6 Exhibit E - State Court Docket Sheet - Raleigh County, #7 Exhibit F - OCC National Bank List as of 06.30.20)(Patterson, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00488(ts).
July 17, 2020 Filing 267 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Rockwell Mining v. Pocahontas Land Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7679024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hayes, Seth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00487 (ts).
July 17, 2020 Filing 266 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Morrow v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7678709. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Summons)(Hill, R.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00486(ts).
July 17, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Plauche v. Lowe's Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7678560. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Parsons, Colton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00485(ts).
July 16, 2020 Filing 264 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Savage v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7677521. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00482 (ts).
July 15, 2020 Filing 263 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Balaban v. Wilson Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7676651. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1 to 7, #2 Exhibits 8 to 9, #3 Exhibits 10 to 14, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Finch, Laura) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00481 (ts).
July 14, 2020 Filing 262 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Gordon v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP, #3 Proposed Order Granting IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00478 (ts).
July 14, 2020 Filing 261 INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGES REMOVED. (Modified on 7/14/2020 to remove summons incorrectly filed; summonses moved to entry #260) (ts).
July 14, 2020 Filing 260 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Perry v. Daniel Beckner, Sr.; Daniel Beckner, Jr.; and Edith Beckner Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7674409. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses)(Ooten, Brian) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00477 (ts).
July 13, 2020 Filing 259 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Dixon v. First Premier Bank Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7673283. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00474 (ts).
July 13, 2020 Filing 258 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY on behalf of Plaintiff. Local counsel: Arden J. Curry, II. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7673260. (Curry, Arden) SEE ECF # 257; CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-473 (ts).
July 13, 2020 Filing 257 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Blatt v. Cabell Huntington Hospital Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7673133. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Curry, Arden) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-473 (ts).
July 10, 2020 Filing 256 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Cochran v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons, #2 consent for jurisdiction of magistrate judge, #3 IFP application)(Lewis, Jaime) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00472 (ts).
July 9, 2020 Filing 255 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. East v. Social Security Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7670013. (Prudich, Gregory) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00471 (ts).
July 9, 2020 Filing 254 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Ohio Valley Environmental Coalition v. Caperton Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7669973. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Becher, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00470 (ts).
July 8, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Vogt v. Macy's Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7669564. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 part 2, #4 Exhibit 2a, #5 Exhibit 2b, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5)(Leonoro, Joseph) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00469 (ts).
July 8, 2020 Filing 252 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Matthew Henry Cantrell v Andrew Saul, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7669342. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Peyton, Thomas) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00467 (ts).
July 8, 2020 Filing 251 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Cotton v. City of Charleston Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7669012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents)(Forman, Isaac) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00465 (ts).
July 6, 2020 Filing 250 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Wall v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 IFP)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00460 (ts).
July 6, 2020 Filing 249 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Micha Daniels v. Townsend Tree Service Company, LLC et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7665896. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Ranson, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00459 (ts).
July 2, 2020 Filing 248 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Shelton v. Collins Career Ctr Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7664281. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Nelson, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00457 (st).
July 2, 2020 Filing 247 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Stone v. C.O. Adams, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7664283. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Oxley, Perry) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00456 (st).
June 30, 2020 Filing 246 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Pennington v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00452 (st).
June 30, 2020 Filing 245 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Hedrick v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 IFP)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00449 (st).
June 30, 2020 Filing 244 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Riffe v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00448 (st).
June 29, 2020 Filing 243 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Porter v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00447 (st).
June 29, 2020 Filing 242 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Imogene Pennington v. The Kroger Co. et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7659953. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- State Court Docket, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Price, Bryan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00446 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2020: #4 State Court Record - Amended Complaint) (ts).
June 29, 2020 Filing 241 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Trump v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed summons, #2 IFP Application, #3 Consent to proceed before US Magistrate Judge)(Lewis, Jaime) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00445 (ts).
June 29, 2020 Filing 240 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Shank v. Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 IFP)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-444 (ts).
June 26, 2020 Filing 239 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Filmanatix LLC v. Erie Insurance, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7658251. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit A to Proof of Filing)(Gaston, Michelle) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00442 (ts).
June 26, 2020 Filing 238 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Melange Cafe LLC v. Erie Insurance, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7658246. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit A to Proof of Filing)(Gaston, Michelle) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-441 (ts).
June 26, 2020 Filing 237 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Ferguson Enterprises v. Wolfe Construction Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7658093. (Harkins, Clayton) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00439 (st).
June 26, 2020 Filing 236 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dudley v. Provantage Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7657903. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Frye, Eric) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00438 (st).
June 26, 2020 Filing 235 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Jones vs Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7657683. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Hicks, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00437 (st).
June 25, 2020 Filing 234 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Brown v. Equitrans Midstream et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7656009. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Brown Consent, #2 Summons - Equitrans, #3 Summons - EQM, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Majestro, Anthony) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00434 (st).
June 24, 2020 Filing 233 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED, Summons, Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. Hanson v. Saul (Harbour, Paula) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00432 (ts).
June 23, 2020 Filing 232 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Avis Rent A Car System, LLC v. Lauren Kaufman, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7653743. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hall, Sharon) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00430 (st).
June 23, 2020 Filing 231 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Radford v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00428 (st).
June 22, 2020 Filing 230 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Settle v. Borovskiy and Lynx Trucking, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7652644. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Saad, Lindsey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00427 (st).
June 22, 2020 Filing 229 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Reeves v. Wayne County Board of Education et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7652111. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons: Wayne County Board of Education, #3 Proposed Summons: Wayne County, #4 Proposed Summons: Wayne County Commission, #5 Proposed Summons: Sheriff Richard Thompson, #6 Proposed Summons: Todd Alexander, #7 Proposed Summons: Howard Meddings, #8 Proposed Summons: Deputy Harry Sowards)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00423 (st).
June 19, 2020 Filing 228 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Michael & Heather Bowling v CMH Homes, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7651009. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Stemple, Jason) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00420 (st).
June 19, 2020 Filing 227 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. O'Brien v. Morris Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7650921. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Frampton, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00419 (st).
June 19, 2020 Filing 226 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Milso Industries Corporation v. General Corporation Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7650419. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Original Lease Agreement, #2 Exhibit B Lease Extensions, #3 Exhibit C Termination Notice, #4 Summons)(Ryan, Thomas) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00418 (st).
June 19, 2020 Filing 225 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. IUOE Local 132 v. Overcash Pipeline Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7650034. (Lowry, Lawrence) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00417 (st).
June 18, 2020 Filing 224 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Chirchir v. Genworth Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7649438. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Marshall, Jonathan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00416 (st).
June 18, 2020 Filing 223 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dowler v. Wexford Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7649300. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit B - Certificate of Compliance)(Mannion, Thomas) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00415 (st).
June 18, 2020 Filing 222 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Bluegrass, LLC v. State Auto. Mut. Ins. Co. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7649132. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ins. Policy, #3 Exhibit Denial Letter, #4 Summons (State Auto. Mut. Ins. Co.))(Barney, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00414 (st).
June 18, 2020 Filing 221 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Ramsey v. Cedar Trucking Co., Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7648693. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(Stayton, Leonard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00413 (st).
June 17, 2020 Filing 220 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hanson et al v. Eagle Loan Company of Ohio, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7648251. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00412 (st).
June 17, 2020 Filing 219 CASE OPENING DOCUMENT FOR A MISCELLANEOUS CASE WITH FEE PAID. MOTION by Plaintiff to Enforce Settlement Filing Fee $47.00. Receipt # CHAR017682. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Malkin, Blaire) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-mc-00095 (st). (Modified on 6/22/2020 to remove Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee - fee paid, receipt #CHAR017682)(ts).
June 17, 2020 Filing 218 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Benson v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Application to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00411 (st).
June 17, 2020 Filing 217 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Elkins v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00410 (st).
June 15, 2020 Filing 216 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Forrest v. Ceva Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7645177. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Lockhart, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00405 (st).
June 15, 2020 Filing 215 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Frye v. Lincoln County Commission Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7644666. (Davenport, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00403 (st).
June 15, 2020 Filing 214 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Dyer v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7644311. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00402 (st).
June 12, 2020 Filing 213 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Uncork and Create v. The Cinn. Ins. Co., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7643846. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Cinn Ins. Co., #3 Summons - Cinn Cas. Co., #4 Summons - Cinn Indem. Co., #5 Exhibit Insurance Policy, #6 Exhibit Denial Letter)(Barney, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00401 (st).
June 12, 2020 Filing 212 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Mahon v. Walmart Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7643044. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Noel, Heather) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00399 (st).
June 12, 2020 Filing 211 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Sharon Lanham v. TransCanada USA Services Inc., et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7643014. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Casto, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00398 (st).
June 12, 2020 Filing 210 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Kirk v. Wal-Mart Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7643029. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Noel, Heather) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00397 (st).
June 12, 2020 Filing 209 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Bailey v. Walmart Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7642991. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 B)(Noel, Heather) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00396 (st).
June 10, 2020 Filing 208 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Lester v. GEICO Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7641275. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Process, Pleadings, Orders, And Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal)(Settles, Christopher) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00395 (st).
June 10, 2020 Filing 207 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Jamison v. Style Nails Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7641195. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nelson, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00393 (st).
June 10, 2020 Filing 206 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Lorie Parsons v. Kroger Limited Partnership I Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7640928. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Moore, Brian) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00392 (st).
June 9, 2020 Filing 205 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Burns v. Saul (Harbour, Paula) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00390 (st).
June 5, 2020 Filing 204 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. CMH Manufacturing, Inc. v. Caruthers Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7636607. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Stemple, Jason) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00387 (st).
June 5, 2020 Filing 203 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Jones v. Wal-Mart Stores East LP et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7636588. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noel, Heather) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00385 (st).
June 5, 2020 Filing 202 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Wallace v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00383 (st).
June 4, 2020 Filing 201 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Dawne M. Boukhemis and Rabah Boukhemis v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as receiver for The First State Bank, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E - Part 1, #7 Exhibit E - Part 2, #8 Exhibit E - Part 3, #9 Exhibit E - Part 4, #10 Exhibit E - Part 5, #11 Exhibit E - Part 6, #12 Exhibit E - Part 7, #13 Exhibit E - Part 8, #14 Exhibit E - Part 9)(Bailey, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00380 (st).
June 4, 2020 Filing 200 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dixon v. City of Saint Albans, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7635297. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notification of Removal)(Adkins, Drannon) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00379 (st).
June 3, 2020 Filing 199 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Roy Hamilton v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as receiver for The First State Bank (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E - Part 1, #7 Exhibit E - Part 2, #8 Exhibit E - Part 3, #9 Exhibit E - Part 4)(Bailey, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00377 (st).
June 2, 2020 Filing 198 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Crawford v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00372 (st).
June 1, 2020 Filing 197 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. U.S. v. All Funds Seized from City Nat'l Bank Acct. ending n 1087, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robeson, Kathleen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00371 (st).
May 29, 2020 Filing 196 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hamilton v. Correctional Officer Ryan Hill, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7629015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00368 (st).
May 29, 2020 Filing 195 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Lively v. Buzzard, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7629007. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00367 (st).
May 27, 2020 Filing 194 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Vickers v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # CWVSDC-7627074. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 PROPOSED SUMMONS, #3 proposed summons, #4 Proposed summons)(Cook, Wendle) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00365 (st).
May 27, 2020 Filing 193 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Stokes Minerals v. Southeastern Land Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7626885. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Summons)(Griffith, M.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00364 (st).
May 26, 2020 Filing 192 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Galbraith v. Construction Unlimited, LLC, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7625897. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Docs)(Lockhart, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00363 (st).
May 26, 2020 Filing 191 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Sergent v. Credit Solutions, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7625556. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patrick, Megan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00362 (st).
May 26, 2020 Filing 190 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. George v. Evergreen Bank Group Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7625552. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patrick, Megan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00361 (st).
May 22, 2020 Filing 189 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Smith v. Jay Bee Oil & Gas Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7624276. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit)(Bailey, Charles)
May 22, 2020 Filing 188 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Holstine v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7624133. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to AG, #2 Proposed Summons as to Commissioner, #3 Proposed Summons as to USA)(Cook, Wendle) (Modified on 5/22/2020 to replace all images and add summons) (ts). CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00359 (st).
May 22, 2020 Filing 187 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Barker v. Gaylor Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7623423. (Attachments: #1 Gaylor Summons, #2 McClure Summons, #3 Vanhorn Summons, #4 Charleston Summons)(Taylor, Chad) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00357 (st).
May 21, 2020 Filing 186 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Wojciehowicz v Chemours Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7623102. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cook, Sean) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00355 (st).
May 21, 2020 Filing 185 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Miller v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7622469. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00352 (st).
May 20, 2020 Filing 184 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. McCoy v. Virginia Drilling Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7621937. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Walters, Richard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00351 (st).
May 20, 2020 Filing 183 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Burns v. DXC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7621456. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Walters, Richard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00349 (st).
May 20, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. James v. McKesson Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7621197. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Jessee, Russell) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00348 (st).
May 20, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dunford v. McKesson Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7621194. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Jessee, Russell) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00347 (st).
May 19, 2020 Filing 180 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Plaintiff for Plaintiff, (Rose, Herschel)
May 19, 2020 Filing 179 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. First Surety v IRS Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7620153. (Rose, Herschel) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00346 (ts).
May 14, 2020 Filing 178 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Fortune v. City of Logan et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7617742. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit)(Williams, Russell) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00339 (st).
May 14, 2020 Filing 177 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Carpenters Pension v. Ocean Construction Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7617420. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Statement of Visiting Attorney, #4 Statement of Visiting Attorney)(Carbone, Mark) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00338 (st).
May 14, 2020 Filing 176 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Thomas v. Saul (Attachments: #1 App to Proceed without Prepay, #2 Proposed Summons WV Atty General, #3 Proposed Summons US Atty General, #4 Proposed Summons Comm of SSA, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boggs, Thomas) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00337 (st).
May 12, 2020 Filing 175 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Harman v. Webb Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7615896. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Danny Webb, #3 Verification)(Slicer, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00336 (st).
May 11, 2020 Filing 174 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Ward v. LiNA Medical USA, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7614650. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - LiNA Medical, #3 Summons - RGH)(Bastress, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00334 (st)
May 11, 2020 Filing 173 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. LITTLE SIX CORPORATION,) d/b/a SHORT MOUNTAIN SILICA v WHISKEY RIVER RESOURCES CORP Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7614559. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Bandy, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00333 (st).
May 8, 2020 Filing 172 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Shumaker V. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7613652. (Harbour, Paula) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00331 (st).
May 7, 2020 Filing 171 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Kestner v. Crandall Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7612476. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Bigelow, Brian) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00323 (st).
May 7, 2020 Filing 170 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Blankenship v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00322 (st).
May 7, 2020 Filing 169 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Erie v. Cooper Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7612379. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Police Report, #2 Exhibit 2/6/20 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3/10/20 Letter, #4 Exhibit 3/30/20 Letter, #5 Exhibit 4/28/20 Letter, #6 Exhibit Certified Policy)(Perry, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00321 (st).
May 7, 2020 Filing 168 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Burnett et al v. Cabell Huntington Hospital, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7612200. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons in a Civil Action)(Ketchum, Bert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00319 (st).
May 6, 2020 Filing 167 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Gillenwater v. Linville Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7611694. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Davenport, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00318 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2020: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2020: #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons 2) (ts).
May 5, 2020 Filing 166 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Perry vs. The United States of America, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7611048. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Myers, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00317 (st).
May 4, 2020 Filing 165 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Campbell v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7609874. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00314 (st).
May 4, 2020 Filing 164 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Bailey v. Justice Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7609699. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Segal, Scott) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00313 (st).
May 4, 2020 Filing 163 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Romans v. Transportation Network V, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7609691. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00312 (st).
April 30, 2020 Filing 162 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. BO-RU v E.C. Source Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7607743. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Adkins, J.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00306 (st).
April 30, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. FDIC-R The First State Bank v. Jeffrey Frye, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Bailey, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00305 (st).
April 30, 2020 Filing 160 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. The Wall Guy et al. v. FDIC-R The First State Bank (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Bailey, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00304 (st).
April 30, 2020 Filing 159 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Mission Coal Wind Down Co. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7607501. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Keefer, Barbara) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00302 (st).
April 29, 2020 Filing 158 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Bush v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7606532. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vessels, Ethan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00300 (st).
April 28, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Innovative Insurance v. AIX Specialty Insurance, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7605672. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Yianne, Tim) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00298 (st).
April 27, 2020 Filing 156 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Gowans v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Supplement)(Francis, Eric) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00295 (st).
April 24, 2020 Filing 155 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Women' s Health Center v. Morrisey, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7603949. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Exhibit Exhibit)(Stark, Loree) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00293 (ts).
April 24, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hensley v. FDIC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7603937. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Mundy, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00292 (ts).
April 24, 2020 Filing 153 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. ALLEN V. SAUL (Harbour, Paula) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00291 (ts).
April 24, 2020 Filing 152 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. FISHER V SAUL (Harbour, Paula) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00290 (ts).
April 24, 2020 Filing 151 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Jarrell, et al. v. Hardy Cellular Telephone Company d.b.a. US Cellular Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7603512. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Initial Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Acceptance of Service by WV Secretary of State, #4 Exhibit Notice to Clerk Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Crim, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00289 (ts).
April 23, 2020 Filing 150 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Jesse v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Paupers Affidavit)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00288 (st).
April 23, 2020 Filing 149 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Dalton v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Paupers Affidavit)(Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00287 (st).
April 23, 2020 Filing 148 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Chrystal Joyce v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7602643. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Ward, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00286 (st).
April 23, 2020 Filing 147 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dearien v. Union Carbide Corporation, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7602545. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Bello, Patricia) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00285 (st).
April 23, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Adkins v. Marfork Coal Co. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7602254. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Herrick, Jordan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00283 (st).
April 22, 2020 Filing 145 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Adkins v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Gillikin, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00281 (st).
April 22, 2020 Filing 144 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Thompson v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00280 (st).
April 21, 2020 Filing 143 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Moles, et al. vs. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7600526. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, #3 Summons for Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company)(McHugh, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00279 (st).
April 20, 2020 Filing 142 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Don Blankenship v. NBCUniversal LLC et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7600028. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Proposed Summons NBCUniversal LLC, #3 Supplement Proposed Summons CNBC LLC)(Simpkins, Jeffrey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00278 (st).
April 20, 2020 Filing 141 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Living Lands LLC v. Jack Cline Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7599785. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Callaghan, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00275 (st).
April 17, 2020 Filing 140 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Forrest v. Foodliner Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7598540. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket and Pleadings)(Montgomery, Timothy) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00270 (st).
April 17, 2020 Filing 139 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Danny Ellis v. Fay Servicing, LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7598411. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A--State Court documents, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B--State Court Docket Sheet)(Barebo, Ashley) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00269 (st).
April 16, 2020 Filing 138 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Bailey v. McDowell County Commission Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7597508. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00268 (st).
April 16, 2020 Filing 137 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Jackson v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00266 (st).
April 15, 2020 Filing 136 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Bell v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00265 (st).
April 15, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Taylor v. UPS Defendants Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7596535. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Fisher, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00264 (st).
April 15, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Kilpatrick v. FCI Beckley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bailey, Jason) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00263 (st).
April 14, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Mullins v Rish Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7595449. (Moore, Brian) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00262 (st).
April 14, 2020 Filing 132 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. U.S. v. $23,265 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Arrest Warrant in Rem)(Robeson, Kathleen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00261 (st).
April 13, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Dykes v. Intec Communications, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7594187. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Hall, Lee) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00259 (st).
April 13, 2020 Filing 130 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Thompson v. Intec Communications, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7594181. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Hall, Lee) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00258 (st).
April 13, 2020 Filing 129 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hensley v. Trull, D.O. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7594127. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Carriger, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00257 (st).
April 13, 2020 Filing 128 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. The Estate of Serelda Burns v. Nationstar Mortgage Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7594079. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Smith, Gary) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00256 (st).
April 8, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Smith v. American Tire Distributors, Inc and Jimmy Elliott Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7591733. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Weber, Constance) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00254 (st).
April 8, 2020 Filing 126 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. 6515 MacCorkle, LLC v. Evanston Ins. Co. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7591569. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hall, Lee) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00253 (st).
April 8, 2020 Filing 125 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Else v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7591148. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00250 (st).
April 7, 2020 Filing 124 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Cai Design, Inc. v. Phoenix Federal et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7590039. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons - Phoenix Federal #2 Mining, LLC, #7 Summons - John F. Hale Jr, #8 Summons - Phoenix Energy Resources, LLC)(Ward, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00242 (st).
April 7, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Canterbury v. White Pine Insurance Company Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7589794. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Disclosure, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loughran, Susan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00241 (st).
April 6, 2020 Filing 122 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Rye v Saul (Lefler, Derrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00232 (st).
April 6, 2020 Filing 121 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Sergent v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7588538. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patrick, Megan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00231 (st).
April 3, 2020 Filing 120 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Daniels v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00230 (st).
April 3, 2020 Filing 119 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Frye v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00229 (st).
April 2, 2020 Filing 118 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Boyce, et al. v. Lowe's Companies, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7587153. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whiteaker, Kristina) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00228 (st).
April 2, 2020 Filing 117 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. DeWall v. McDowell County Commission et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7587064. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00227 (st).
April 2, 2020 Filing 116 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hornick v. SEIU Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7587038. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Maroney, Patrick) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00226 (st).
April 1, 2020 Filing 115 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Darwish v. Ethicon, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7586339. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cutter, Curtis) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00225 (st).
April 1, 2020 Filing 114 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Henderson v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00224 (st).
March 26, 2020 Filing 113 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Saunders v. Frame, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7582283. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Stroebel, Paul) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00220 (st).
March 25, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Persinger v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7580635. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Exhibit Proof of Filing NoFNoR, #6 Civil Cover Sheet CCIS)(Stryker, Elizabeth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00219 (st).
March 25, 2020 Filing 111 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Vance v, Gurram M.D. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7580330. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of administration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 proposed summons)(Lindsay, Richard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00218 (st).
March 25, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Charlene Chandler v. Greenlight Financial Services, U.S. Bank National Assoication and Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7580308. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State court docket sheet and other documents)(Barebo, Ashley) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00217 (st).
March 24, 2020 Filing 109 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. SGS North America v. ERP Environmnental Fund, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7579774. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons - ERP Environ, #14 Summons - Phoenix, #15 Summons - Clarke)(Cardi, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00216 (st).
March 24, 2020 Filing 108 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Webb and Bryan v. CMH Homes, et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7579271. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00214 (st).
March 24, 2020 Filing 107 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Merlin Enterprises LLC v. Liberty Mutual Group d/b/a Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7579242. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Underlying court documents)(Harter, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00213 (st).
March 24, 2020 Filing 106 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Hardee v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00212 (st).
March 24, 2020 Filing 105 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Miller v. Boston Scientific Corporation Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7578948. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Schriever, Ryan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00211 (st).
March 23, 2020 Filing 104 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Zappin v Supple et al. (Zappin, Anthony) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00210 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #1 IFP Application) (ts).
March 23, 2020 Filing 103 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Zappin v. Hamilton et al. (Zappin, Anthony) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00209 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2020: #1 IFP Application) (ts).
March 20, 2020 Filing 102 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund v. Cornerstone Electric LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7577585. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons)(Dascoli, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00207 (ts).
March 20, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Vincent Schneider v. Dodson Brothers Exterminating Co., Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7577452. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1)(Carr, Kevin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00206 (ts).
March 20, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Mali v. CSAA, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7577169. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-5)(Keefer, Barbara) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00205 (st). (Modified on 3/23/2020 to update civil action no.)(ts).
March 20, 2020 Filing 99 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Matheny v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 Proposed IFP Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00203 (st).
March 20, 2020 Filing 98 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Moses v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 Proposed IFP Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00202 (st).
March 20, 2020 Filing 97 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. File v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576821. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vessels, Ethan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00201 (st).
March 20, 2020 Filing 96 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Smith v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576811. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vessels, Ethan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00200 (st).
March 19, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Warr v Rish Equipment Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576549. (Moore, Brian) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00199 (st).
March 19, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Higginbotham v. Appalachian Railcar Services LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576499. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Leonoro, Joseph) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00198 (st).
March 19, 2020 Filing 93 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Riffle and Thomas v. E.I. Du Pont De Nemours Co. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576479. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00197 (st).
March 19, 2020 Filing 92 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Walker v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00196 (st).
March 19, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Clevenger v. Metropolitan Huntington, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576390. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Exhibit 6)(Mowen, Kelly) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00195 (st).
March 19, 2020 Filing 90 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Dees v. Evinger Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7576154. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Schwirian, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00193 (st).
March 18, 2020 Filing 89 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Tomblin v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00192 (st).
March 17, 2020 Filing 88 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Nations Fund I, LLC v. Cunningham Energy LLC and Ryan Cunningham Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7574873. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Cunningham Energy LLC, #3 Proposed Summons for Ryan Cunningham, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Verification)(Slicer, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00191 (st).
March 17, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Kerr v. McKay Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7574795. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summonses, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Returns of Service, #5 Exhibit D - Docket Sheet)(David, Caleb) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00190 (st).
March 17, 2020 Filing 86 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Newell v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7574462. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Hill, R.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00189 (st).
March 17, 2020 Filing 85 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Lynch v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7574368. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Hill, R.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00188 (st).
March 17, 2020 Filing 84 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Parsons v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7574354. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Hill, R.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00187 (st).
March 17, 2020 Filing 83 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Life v. DuPont Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7574331. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Hill, R.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00186 (st).
March 16, 2020 Filing 82 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hoke v. Marshall University Board of Governors Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7573514. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(Shuman, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00185 (st).
March 16, 2020 Filing 81 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Shuff v. Bank of America Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7573422. (Pomponio, Bren) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00184 (st).
March 13, 2020 Filing 80 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Nicole Parsons v. Pactiv, LLC Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7572189. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Info Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Carter, D.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00183 (st).
March 13, 2020 Filing 79 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Cline v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00182 (st).
March 10, 2020 Filing 78 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. White v. MasTec Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7568387. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Summons)(McQueen, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00179 (st).
March 10, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Corpuz-Wilson v. Trans Union, LLC, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7567775. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interest)(Ryan, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00176 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/10/2020: #7 State court documents) (ts).
March 9, 2020 Filing 76 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Crank V. Saul (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Financial waiver)(Harbour, Paula) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00175 (st).
March 9, 2020 Filing 75 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Albright vs Saul Commissioner of SSA (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Application Proceed without payment)(Hicks, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00174 (st).
March 9, 2020 Filing 74 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Hines v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00171 (st).
March 9, 2020 Filing 73 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Cloninger v Harvey Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7566594. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Cook, Sean) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00170 (st).
March 6, 2020 Filing 72 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Fanary v. Equifax et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7565453. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Nolan, Jed) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00169 (st).
March 6, 2020 Filing 71 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hatfield v. Martin Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7564991. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(McQueen, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00168 (st).
March 4, 2020 Filing 70 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Gautier v. Tams Management, Inc. et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7562540. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 PROPOSED SUMMONS, #3 PROPOSED SUMMONS, #4 PROPOSED SUMMONS, #5 PROPOSED SUMMONS, #6 PROPOSED SUMMONS)(Petsonk, Samuel) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00165 (st).
March 4, 2020 Filing 69 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Abel v Niche Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7562558. (Moore, Brian) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00164 (st).
March 4, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Farley v. Phillips & Jordan, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7562505. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B -- Certified Docket Sheet)(Callas, Gretchen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00163 (st).
March 4, 2020 Filing 67 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Robbie McGee v. Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7562444. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Walmart)(Carter, D.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00162 (st).
March 4, 2020 Filing 66 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Eugene Scalia v. Pritchard Mining Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Forney, Geoffrey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00161 (st).
March 2, 2020 Filing 65 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. McNeely v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 IFP)(Dils, Jan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00158 (st).
February 27, 2020 Filing 64 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Blaylock, Jr. v. UPS Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7556830. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sparks, Aubrey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00156 (st).
February 27, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Broyles v. Select Portfolio, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7556432. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Pleadings & Other Relevant Documents on File with Circuit Court of Kanawha County, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - OCC National Bank List)(Patterson, Matthew) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00154 (st).
February 27, 2020 Filing 62 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Robinson v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7556121. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sheridan, Benjamin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00152 (st).
February 21, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. AMBER HALL V. GESTAMP WEST VIRGINIA, LLC, ET AL. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7550291. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Shah, Raj) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00146 (ts).
February 20, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7549510. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet)(Powell, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00143 (ts)
February 20, 2020 Filing 59 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Cox v. Huntington Museum of Art, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7549275. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00142
February 19, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. WM v. Braskem America, Inc Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7548376. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weber, Constance) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00141
February 19, 2020 Filing 57 IMAGE REMOVED AS INCORRECTLY FILED. (Modified on 2/20/2020 to remove image and add to ECF #52) (ts).
February 19, 2020 Filing 56 IMAGE REMOVED AS INCORRECTLY FILED. (Modified on 2/20/2020 to remove image and add to ECF #52)(ts).
February 19, 2020 Filing 55 IMAGE REMOVED AS INCORRECTLY FILED. (Modified on 2/20/2020 to remove image and add to ECF#52) (ts).
February 19, 2020 Filing 54 IMAGE REMOVED AS INCORRECTLY FILED. (Modified on 2/20/2020 to remove image and add to ECF#52) (ts).
February 19, 2020 Filing 53 IMAGE REMOVED AS INCORRECTLY FILED. (Modified on 2/20/2020 to remove image and add to ECF#52) (ts).
February 19, 2020 Filing 52 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Truist Bank v. Farmer Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7547861. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Knobbe, Travis) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00139 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2020: #5 Farmer Summons, #6 J. Farmer Summons, #7 R. Farmer Summons, #8 C. Farmer Summons, #9 Disclosure Statement) (ts). (Modified on 2/20/2020 to add attachments 5 through 9 originally filed at ECF #53 through 57) (ts).
February 18, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Armstrong v. Gateway Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7546978. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Tully, Jared) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00137 (st). (Modified on 2/19/2020 to replace main document and exhibit C)(ts).
February 18, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Stacy Brooks v. Stryker Sustainability Solutions, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7546833. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit State Court documents)(Carr, Kevin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00133 (st).
February 18, 2020 Filing 49 CERTIFICATION OF A JUDGMENT TO BE REGISTERED IN ANOTHER DISTRICT WITH FEE PAID. BMO Harris Bank, N.A. v. Donald Vanover Filing Fee $47.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7546577. (Thompson, Stephen) MISC. CASE NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-mc-00042 (st).
February 17, 2020 Filing 48 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Trustees of the 4th District IBEW Health Fund v. H & H Electric Corporation Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7545450. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Letter of Assent, #2 Exhibit A-2 CRA, #3 Exhibit B Trust Agreement, #4 Exhibit C Collection Policy, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Dascoli, John) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00131 (st).
February 14, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Burke v. Carol, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7544577. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00128 (st).
February 12, 2020 Filing 46 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. U.S. v. $30,000 in U.S. currency (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice in Rem)(Robeson, Kathleen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00123 (st).
February 11, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Puffinberger v. 3M et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7541787. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Evans, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00122 (st).
February 11, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Boggs, et al., v. Greyhound Lines, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7541750. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shah, Raj) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00121 (st).
February 11, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hannah v. United Parcel Service, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7541445. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Wallace, Richard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00120 (st).
February 11, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Swiger v. A.R. Wilfley & Sons, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7540946. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, Amended Complaint, Docket Sheets, #3 Exhibit Swiger deposition excerpt, #4 Exhibit Vimasco Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Vimasco Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Exhibit Core & Main Consent, #7 Exhibit Mueller Co. Consent)(Hayes, Mark) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00117 (st).
February 10, 2020 Filing 41 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Ramirez v Ethicon, Inc. et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7539576. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirchmer, Christopher) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00116 (st).
February 10, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Edmunds v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7539375. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Delk, David) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00114 (st).
February 7, 2020 Filing 39 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Corns v. Goodwill Industries of KYOWVA Area, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7538597. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Glazer, Hoyt) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00112 (st).
February 6, 2020 Filing 38 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Dalton v. The Dow Chemical Company et al Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7537568. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Dow Summons, #3 Exhibit Union Carbide Summons, #4 Exhibit Bayer Summons)(Walters, Richard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00110 (st).
February 5, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #37 Complaint. ERROR: Images contained incorrect information. CORRECTION: Images removed and replaced with correct images. (kew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 37 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Keener v. Second Round Sub Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7535319. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Broadwater, Steven) (Modified on 2/5/2020 to remove and replace images) (kew). CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00106 (st).
February 3, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Northcraft v West Virginia Division of Corrections and Rehabilitation, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7533158. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00100 (st).
February 3, 2020 Filing 35 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. CMFG Life Insurance Company v. Amy J. Nicholas, St. Mary's Medical Center and CAMC Neurology Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7533051. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McQuain, Elise) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00099 (st).
January 31, 2020 Filing 34 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Stover v Blackhawk Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7531753. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Cook, Sean) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00096 (st).
January 31, 2020 Filing 33 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Cynthia M. Weikle v. United States Dept. of Agriculture Rural Housing Service, et. al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7531471. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Brown, Sarah) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00095 (st).
January 29, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Shepherd v. C.R. Bard Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7528258. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet)(Bird, Melissa) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00072 (st).
January 29, 2020 Filing 31 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hayworth v. RoundPoint Mortgage Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7528185. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eddy, Kevin) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00071 (st). (Modified on 1/29/2020 to replace main image) (ts).
January 28, 2020 Filing 30 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Jumper v. Polymer Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7526167. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Bailey, Timothy) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00067 (st). (Modified on 1/28/2020 to replace unsigned complaint) (ts).
January 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Pack v. Cobalt Coal Corp., Mining, Inc. et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # BWVSDC-7525402. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Pure Energy Certified Mail Receipt, #3 Exhibit McClay Certified Mail Receipt, #4 Exhibit WF Coal Certified Mail Receipt, #5 Exhibit Amended Summons and Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Preservati, Nicholas) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00066 (st).
January 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Hoke v. USDA Rural Housing Service (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Certificaiton, #4 Exhibit State Court Docket and Documents)(Arthur, Christopher) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00065 (st).
January 24, 2020 Filing 27 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Cunningham v Vesta Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7523544. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons (Joshua William Coleman), #3 Summons (Rick Cott), #4 Summons (Vesta O&G Holdings, LLC), #5 Summons (Vesta VFO, LLC))(Webb, Kenneth) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00061 (st).
January 24, 2020 Filing 26 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. G.T., by his parents Michelle and Jamie T., et al. v. Kanawha County School et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7523113. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Milnes, Lydia) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00057 (st). (Modified on 1/24/2020 to replace unsigned image) (ts).
January 24, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Stepp v. Brooks Run South Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7522589. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Circuit Express, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lansden, Jill) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 5:20-cv-00055 (st).
January 23, 2020 Filing 24 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Christian v. Commissioner of Social Security Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7520956. (Prudich, Gregory) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00051 (st).
January 21, 2020 Filing 23 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. U.S. v. $29,781.79 seized from Huntington Federal Savings Bank, et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant of Arrest and Notice in Rem)(Robeson, Kathleen) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00050 (st).
January 20, 2020 Filing 22 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Stephens v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00046 (st).
January 17, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Wheeler v. Zimmer Biomet Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7517045. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lusk, Neva) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00045 (st).
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Bukovinsky v. Huntington Bank of West Virginia Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7516773. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Rice, Jill) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00044 (st).
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Sayer v. Colony Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7514448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Farrell, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00040 (st).
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Bonnett v. 1st Time Transportation Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7512706. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glyptis, Phillip) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00039 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2020: #3 Circuit Court Docket Sheet) (ts).
January 13, 2020 Filing 17 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Davis v. Milton Police Department Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7512351. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Joseph) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00036 (st).
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Davis v. WVRJ Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7512019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Carder, Jeffrey) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00034 (st).
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 COMPLAINT WITH NO FEE REQUIRED. Straw v. Saul (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 IFP Application, #4 IFP Proposed Order)(Meisel, James) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00028 (st).
January 10, 2020 Filing 14 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. York v. Appalachian Regional Healthcare Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7510259. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons)(Walters, Richard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00026 (st).
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Hughes v. Seventeenth Street Associates Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7510076. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Walters, Richard) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00025 (st).
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Gilmore v. McCoy Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7509321. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Defendants McCoy and Mena's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #5 Defendants McCoy and Mena's Motion to Dismiss Counts III and V)(Mullins, Michael) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00022 (st).
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Bulldog Excavating, LLC v. Rudd Equipment Company, Inc. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7509131. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sammons, W.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00021 (st).
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hager v. Knox, et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7508448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Murray, William) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00020 (st).
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Prudich v. Saul Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7508169. (Prudich, Gregory) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00019 (st).
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Jackson v. Amherst Madison Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7506988. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Aldridge, Evan) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00018 (st).
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Walters v. Norfolk Southern Railway Co Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7506487. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Berthold, Robert) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 1:20-cv-00017 (st).
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Beverly Dawn Nelson, et al. v. I & I Sling, Inc., et al. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7505513. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibi A - Appointment Paper, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons I&I Sling, #4 Exhibit Summons Brewer)(Carter, D.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00015 (st).
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Keena Poole v Target Corp Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7505489. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh 1 - July 25, 2019 Letter, #3 Exhibit Exh A - Docket, #4 Exhibit Exh B - Summons, #5 Exhibit Exh C - Complaint, #6 Proof of Removal)(Biser, Rita) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00014 (st).
January 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Henry v. Lewis et al Filing Fee $400.00 Receipt # CHAR016847. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kesner, Tanya) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00004 (st). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2020: #2 Receipt) (ts).
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH FEE PAID. Hatfield v. Hoff Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7500395. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Oxley, Perry) (Modified on 1/3/2020 to add exhibit 1) (ts). CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 2:20-cv-00002 (st).
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT WITH FEE PAID. Entsminger v. Scott Depot AID II OPCO, LLC d/b/a Rolling Meadows Place Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7500308. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Salango, C.) CIVIL ACTION NO. ASSIGNED: 3:20-cv-00001 (st).
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 INCORRECT FILING; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 1/3/2020 to remove images re: Critchfield v. Treace incorrectly filed in SDWV by receipt # AWVSDC-7500077) (ts).
January 1, 2020 2020 CIVIL SHELL CASE OPENING. (mwk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plaintiff v. Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?