Canterbury et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: April L. Canterbury and Christopher Canterbury
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Chrysler Group, LLC and Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc. doing business as Dutch Miller Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Case Number: 2:2021cv00017
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 6/21/2021. The parties shall serve all discovery requests by 1/3/2022, and complete all depositions by 2/15/2022. Expert Witness List by the party bearing the burden of proof due no later than 12/17/2021, by the party not bearing the burden of proof due no later than 1/17/2022, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due no later than 2/1/2022. All dispositive motions, except those filed under Rule 12(b), shall be filed and served by 3/7/2022, with responses due by 3/21/2022, and replies due by 3/28/2022. Settlement Meeting to be held no later than 5/9/2022. All motions in limine shall be filed and served by 3/7/2022, with responses due by 3/21/2022. The plaintiff portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 5/12/2022, and the integrated pretrial order due for entry no later than 5/19/2022. A pretrial conference shall be held at 9:00 AM on 6/16/2022. Proposed charges to the jury due by 6/21/2022. A final settlement conference shall be held at 9:00 AM on 6/16/2022. Trial of this action shall be held at 9:00 AM on 6/28/2022 before Judge Thomas E. Johnston. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/1/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
March 1, 2021 Filing 13 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 3/1/2021; (slw)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc., FCA US LLC, April L. Canterbury, Christopher Canterbury. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooke, Andrew) (Modified on 2/23/2021 to add party filers)(ts).
February 22, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 2/16/2021 as to Gray Media Group, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003070706. (kew)
February 3, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Vehicle Inspection by FCA US LLC (Cooke, Andrew)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc. (Cooke, Andrew)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant FCA US LLC (Cooke, Andrew)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Intent to Issue Subpoenas Duces Tecum Upon Gray Media Group, Inc., d/b/a WSAZ and West Virginia Office of the Chief Medical Examiner by Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc., FCA US LLC (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tuggle, Mitchell)
January 14, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc. in support of #5 MOTION by Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Gordon, Tyler)
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION by Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Gordon, Tyler)
January 14, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by FCA US LLC.(Gordon, Tyler)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 2/1/2021. Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/15/2021. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 2/22/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM on 3/1/2021. Entry of Scheduling Order 3/5/2021. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 3/15/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 1/12/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
January 11, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 8, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Incorrect civil cover sheet attached. CORRECTION: Incorrect image removed and replaced with correct image. (lca)
January 7, 2021 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc., FCA US LLC with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-7846135. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canterbury et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Tyler Dean Gordon
Represented By: Mitchell B. Tuggle
Represented By: Andrew B. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group, LLC
Represented By: Tyler Dean Gordon
Represented By: Mitchell B. Tuggle
Represented By: Andrew B. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutch Miller of Charleston, Inc. doing business as Dutch Miller Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram
Represented By: Tyler Dean Gordon
Represented By: Mitchell B. Tuggle
Represented By: Andrew B. Cooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April L. Canterbury
Represented By: Barry Christopher Marcum
Represented By: Greg K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Canterbury
Represented By: Barry Christopher Marcum
Represented By: Greg K. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?