McMillion et al v. Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Plaintiff: Dale L. McMillion, Alicia D. McMillion and D. Lane McMillion
Defendant: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00139
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under F.R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 4/19/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) Meeting - 4/29/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 5/6/2021. Scheduling Conference at 11:00 AM on 5/14/2021 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse in Charleston, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 5/20/2021. Last day to serve F.R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures - 5/31/2021. Signed by Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 3/30/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (kew)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint, by Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC.(Bagnell, Nicolle)
March 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicolle S. Bagnell on behalf of Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC. (Bagnell, Nicolle)
March 3, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Isak Jordan Howell updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Alicia D. McMillion, D. Lane McMillion, Dale L. McMillion. (Howell, Isak)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mms)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7892271. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Easement 1, #2 Exhibit B - Easement 2, #3 Proposed Summons as to Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillion et al v. Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale L. McMillion
Represented By: Isak Jordan Howell
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia D. McMillion
Represented By: Isak Jordan Howell
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. Lane McMillion
Represented By: Isak Jordan Howell
Represented By: Joseph Mark Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Valley Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Nicolle S. Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?