Fair American Insurance and Reinsurance Company v. Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fair American Insurance and Reinsurance Company
Defendant: Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc., Mickey L. Farmer, Jr. and Jeanne M. Farmer
Case Number: 2:2021cv00212
Filed: April 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received by Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc. re: #12 Clerk's Entry of Default. (Attachment: #1 Return Receipt - Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc. - KY) (ts)
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc. pursuant to Federal Rules Civil Procedure 55(a). (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt - Elkview #1, #2 Certified Mail Receipt - Elkview #2, #3 Certified Mail Receipt - KY) (cc: counsel of record; defendant via certified mail) (ts)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION by Fair American Insurance and Reinsurance Company for Entry of Default by Clerk against Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Thomas J. Moran), #2 Exhibit B (WV Secretary of State Business Information for Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc.))(Moran, Thomas)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 5/24/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 6/7/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 6/14/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM on 6/18/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 6/23/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 5/3/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint, by Jeanne M. Farmer. (tmr)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint, by Mickey L. Farmer, Jr. (tmr)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Jeanne M. Farmer, Jeanne M. Farmer served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Moran, Thomas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Mickey L. Farmer, Jr, Mickey L. Farmer, Jr served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Moran, Thomas)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc., Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc. served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Moran, Thomas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff Fair American Insurance and Reinsurance Company (Moran, Thomas)
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc., Mickey L. Farmer, Jr. and Jeanne M. Farmer re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Mickey L. Farmer, Jr., #2 Summons as to Jeanne M. Farmer) (mms)
April 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7918632. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - General Agreement of Indemnity, #2 Exhibit 2A - BSA Welcome Center Bonds, #3 Exhibit 2B - Runway 27 Bonds, #4 Exhibit 2C - Chief Logan Lodge Bonds, #5 Exhibit 2D - Cow Creek Bonds, #6 Exhibit 2E - Morrisvale/Cameo Bonds, #7 Exhibit 3 - Termination Letter, #8 Exhibit 4 - Takeover Agreement, #9 Exhibit 5 - Completion Contract, #10 Proposed Summons as to Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc., #11 Proposed Summons as to Mickey L. Farmer, Jr., #12 Proposed Summons as to Jeanne M. Farmer, #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms)
April 6, 2021 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair American Insurance and Reinsurance Company v. Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Valley Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mickey L. Farmer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne M. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fair American Insurance and Reinsurance Company
Represented By: Thomas J. Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?