Clarke v. Tango Networks, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen S. Clarke
Defendant: Tango Networks, Inc., Nextep Business Solutions, Inc., Trinet HR II-A, Inc. and doing business as Trinet Group, Inc., Michael Bishop and Trinet HR III-A, Inc. doing business as Trinet Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00546
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting the #25 Motion and stays this action; the Clerk is directed to remove this action from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 11/19/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 UNOPPOSED MOTION by Nextep Business Solutions, Inc., Tango Networks, Inc., Trinet HR III-A, Inc., Michael Bishop to Stay Case. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order)(Moore, Brian) (Modified on 11/18/2021 to add party filers) (kew).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Trinet HR III-A, Inc. (ts)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF by Trinet HR III-A, Inc. to #19 Response In Opposition. (Hulse, Nicholas)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY by Nextep Business Solutions, Inc. to #20 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Brian)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Kathleen S. Clarke, Tango Networks, Inc., Nextep Business Solutions, Inc., Trinet HR III-A, Inc., Michael Bishop. (Lowe, Cory) (Modified on 11/16/2021 to add party filers) (kew).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE by Kathleen S. Clarke in opposition to #13 MOTION by Nextep Business Solutions, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lowe, Cory)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE by Kathleen S. Clarke in opposition to #9 MOTION by Trinet HR III-A, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lowe, Cory)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cory Brandon Lowe on behalf of Kathleen S. Clarke. (Lowe, Cory)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by Trinet HR III-A, Inc. (Hulse, Nicholas)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Nextep Business Solutions, Inc. (Moore, Brian)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT FOR REMOVAL by Nextep Business Solutions, Inc. (Moore, Brian)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Nextep Business Solutions, Inc. in support of #13 MOTION by Nextep Business Solutions, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Moore, Brian)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Nextep Business Solutions, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Moore, Brian) (Modified on 10/27/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION by Michael Bishop, Tango Networks, Inc. in support of #11 Reply to Response. (Snethen, Craig)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF by Michael Bishop, Tango Networks, Inc. to #8 Response In Opposition. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A)(Snethen, Craig) (Modified on 10/28/2021 to remove link to #6 motion and #7 brief and to add party filer) (kew).
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Trinet HR III-A, Inc. in support of #9 MOTION by Trinet HR III-A, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Hulse, Nicholas)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Trinet HR III-A, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Hulse, Nicholas)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE by Kathleen S. Clarke in opposition to #6 MOTION by Michael Bishop, Tango Networks, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Bailess, Todd)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEF by Michael Bishop, Tango Networks, Inc. in support of #6 MOTION by Michael Bishop, Tango Networks, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint. (Snethen, Craig)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Michael Bishop, Tango Networks, Inc. to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order and Writ)(Snethen, Craig) (Modified on 10/6/2021 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew). Modified on 10/6/2021 (kew).
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Jodi Renee Durham updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Kathleen S. Clarke. (Durham, Jodi)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 10/26/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 11/9/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 11/15/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 11/19/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 11/24/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/5/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Tango Networks, Inc. (Snethen, Craig)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Bishop, Tango Networks, Inc. with summons, complaint, docket sheet and consents to removal from the Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8045768. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 State Court Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. Tango Networks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen S. Clarke
Represented By: Jodi Renee Durham
Represented By: Todd S. Bailess
Represented By: Cory Brandon Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tango Networks, Inc.
Represented By: Craig W. Snethen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nextep Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Moore
Represented By: Rebecca Trump Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinet HR II-A, Inc. and doing business as Trinet Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Hulse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bishop
Represented By: Craig W. Snethen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinet HR III-A, Inc. doing business as Trinet Group, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Scott Hulse
Represented By: Travis Wayne Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?