Hylton et al v. CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Hylton and Greever Asbury
Defendant: CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00559
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 16 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
October 14, 2021 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Virginia Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-00029. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Senior Judge James P. Jones on 10/14/2021. (am) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
October 14, 2021 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
October 13, 2021 Filing 13 Exhibit Agreed [Proposed] Order by CONSOL Energy, Inc.. (Raupp, Peter) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case by CONSOL Energy, Inc.. (Raupp, Peter) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
October 8, 2021 Filing 11 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (flc) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE Order to Respond re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue Plaintiffs' Responses due by 10/19/2021. Entered by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/5/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(PMS) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by CONSOL Energy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Raupp, Peter) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONSOL Energy, Inc. (Raupp, Peter) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by CONSOL Energy, Inc..(Raupp, Peter) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
August 15, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Donald Hylton, Greever Asbury. CONSOL Energy, Inc. waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021.(Petsonk, Samuel) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
July 23, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to CONSOL Energy, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(lml) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
July 21, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for CONSOL ENERGY, INC. by Greever Asbury, Donald Hylton (Petsonk, Samuel) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 6/28/21. (ejs) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Sam B. Petsonk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number BVAWDC-3726698. by Greever Asbury, Donald Hylton. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of good standing)(Cromer, Mary) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CONSOL Energy, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number CVAWDC-3725425), filed by Donald Hylton, Greever Asbury. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ar) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 10/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hylton et al v. CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Hylton
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Laura C. Davidson
Represented By: Samuel Brown Petsonk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greever Asbury
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Laura C. Davidson
Represented By: Samuel Brown Petsonk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONSOL Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?