Booth v. Moses Nissan, LLC
Plaintiff: Rustyn Booth
Defendant: Moses Nissan, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00564
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rustyn Booth for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant Moses Nissan, LLC. (Peyton, Thomas)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for is canceled and this case shall proceed as follows: Amending the pleadings or joining parties - 1/10/2022. Last date to serve discovery requests - 5/16/2022. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 4/26/2022. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 5/26/2022. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 6/16/2022. Discovery to close - 6/30/2022. Dispositive motions deadline - 7/20/2022. Response to dispositive motion - 8/3/2022. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 8/10/2022. Settlement meeting - 9/20/2022. Motion in limine deadline - 9/27/2022. Responses for motions in limine - 10/4/2022. Proposed pretrial order to defendant - 9/26/2022. Integrated pretrial order - 10/3/2022. Pretrial Conference on 10/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Proposed jury charge - 11/8/2022. Final settlement conference on 10/27/2022 at 9:00 a.m. Trial on 11/15/2022 at 9:00 a.m., before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/3/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
December 3, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Moses Nissan, LLC of Rustyn Booth on February 24, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. (Kowalkowski, Sarah)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER Setting forth the terms for the handling of confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/17/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GOVERNING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIAL UNDER RULE 502(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/17/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AGREED ORDER GOVERNING THE INADVERTENT DISCLOSURE OF DOCUMENTS OR OTHER MATERIAL UNDER RULE 502(d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley on 11/17/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
November 16, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moses Nissan, LLC for First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. (Kowalkowski, Sarah)
November 16, 2021 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Moses Nissan, LLC, Rustyn Booth. (Kowalkowski, Sarah) (Modified on 11/17/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
November 16, 2021 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Order Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(d) by Moses Nissan, LLC, Rustyn Booth. (Kowalkowski, Sarah) (Modified on 11/17/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER Order Governing the Inadvertent Disclosure of Documents or Other Material Under Rule 502(b) by Moses Nissan, LLC, Rustyn Booth. (Kowalkowski, Sarah) (Modified on 11/17/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order by Moses Nissan, LLC, Rustyn Booth. (Kowalkowski, Sarah) (Modified on 11/17/2021 to add party filer) (kew).
November 10, 2021 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Moses Nissan, LLC (Kowalkowski, Sarah)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Moses Nissan, LLC. (Carr, Kevin)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 11/15/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 11/29/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - 12/6/2021. Telephonic Scheduling Conference at 2:30 PM on 12/10/2021, before the undersigned, unless canceled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 12/15/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) disclosures - 12/23/2021. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 10/21/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
October 20, 2021 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
October 19, 2021 CASE assigned to Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Moses Nissan, LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from the Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8058974. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booth v. Moses Nissan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rustyn Booth
Represented By: Thomas H. Peyton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Nissan, LLC
Represented By: Kevin L. Carr
Represented By: Sarah E. Kowalkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?