Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB et al v. Young et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB and Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A
Defendant: Scott Edwin Young and Laura Louise Young
Counter Defendant: CitiFinancial Credit Company and Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Interested Party: AHP Servicing LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00142
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2023 Filing 17 TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of #16 Order of Dismissal, to pro-se party, counsel of record. (lca)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL directing that the remaining requirements and deadlines contained in the scheduling order be suspended and that this action be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and STRICKEN from the docket of the Court; any motions pending at the time of this dismissal are hereby TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 5/1/2023. (cc: certified to any pro se party, counsel of record) (lca)
April 4, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Laura Louise Young, Scott Edwin Young, Scott Edwin Young, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A, CitiFinancial Credit Company. (Fleu, Colten) (Modified on 4/5/2023 to add party filers) (kew).
October 24, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CitiFinancial Credit Company for First Requests for Admissions, Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff. (Price, Bryan)
August 4, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Colten Lewis Fleu appearing on behalf of Scott Edwin Young. (Fleu, Colten)
July 28, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Edwin Young for Discovery Requests to Counterclaim-Defendants. (Brown, Sarah)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott Edwin Young for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Brown, Sarah)
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CitiFinancial Credit Company for Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Price, Bryan)
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AHP Servicing LLC, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures. (Timony, Patrick)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference previously scheduled for 5/12/2022 is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 7/1/2022. Last date to serve discovery requests - 10/24/2022. All discovery to be completed - 11/16/2022. Last date to complete depositions - 12/8/2022. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 10/7/2022. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 11/8/2022. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 11/23/2022. Dispositive motions deadline - 12/28/2022. Responses to dispositive motions are due within 14 days, with replies due within 7 days. Settlement Meeting must be held 45 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Mediation must be concluded 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. A written status report is due within 5 days of completion of mediation. If the case is not settled, all Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures are due 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Motions in limine deadline - 3/16/2023. Responses for motions in limine - 3/24/2023. Proposed voir dire, jury instructions, and verdict form - 4/24/2023. The Plaintiff's portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 4/20/2023, Integrated pretrial order - 4/27/2023. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference on 5/4/2023 at 11:00 AM. Trial on 5/15/2023 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/27/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 WORKSHEET by CitiFinancial Credit Company re: #6 Rule 26(f) Report of Planning Meeting. (Price, Bryan) (Modified on 4/26/2022 to add link to #6 rule 26 report) (kew).
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by CitiFinancial Credit Company, Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, AHP Servicing LLC, Scott Edwin Young. (Price, Bryan) (Modified on 4/26/2022 to add party filers) (kew).
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 JOINT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by AHP Servicing LLC, Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A, Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB. (McMillan, Stuart)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 4/14/2022. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 4/21/2022. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 4/28/2022. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM in Charleston, West Virginia on 5/12/2022, before the undersigned, unless cancelled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 5/19/2022. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) initial disclosures pre-discovery - 5/26/2022. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/25/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
March 24, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER TO AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiFinancial Credit Company. (Price, Bryan) (Modified on 3/25/2022 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (kew).
March 21, 2022 CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CitiFinancial Credit Company with summons, complaint, answer with jury demand and amended counterclaim, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit/Magistrate Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #BWVSDC-8154605. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB et al v. Young et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Emmanuel D. Voces
Represented By: Patrick C. Timony
Represented By: Robert Charles Kelly
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: W. Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A
Represented By: Emmanuel D. Voces
Represented By: Patrick C. Timony
Represented By: Robert Charles Kelly
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: W. Scott Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Edwin Young
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Sarah K. Brown
Represented By: Colten Lewis Fleu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Louise Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: CitiFinancial Credit Company
Represented By: Bryan N. Price
Represented By: Kace M. Legg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Represented By: W. Scott Campbell
Represented By: Emmanuel D. Voces
Represented By: Patrick C. Timony
Represented By: Robert Charles Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AHP Servicing LLC
Represented By: Patrick C. Timony
Represented By: Stuart A. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?