Active Resources, Inc. et al v. Hagewood et al
Counter Defendant: Active Resources, Inc. and Jon Nix
Counter Claimant: Jack Hagewood and Glacier Resources, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00172
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: The amendment of any pleading and the joinder of any party shall be completed no later than 7/22/2022. Last date to serve discovery requests - 1/20/2023. All discovery to be completed - 2/10/2023. Last date to complete depositions - 3/3/2023. Opening Rule 26 expert disclosures - 6/10/2022. Responsive Rule 26 expert disclosures - 6/24/2022. Rebuttal Rule 26 expert disclosure - 7/8/2022. Dispositive motions deadline - 3/24/2023. Responses to dispositive motions are due within 14 days, with replies due within 7 days. Settlement Meeting must be held 45 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Mediation must be concluded 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. A written status report is due within 5 days of completion of mediation. If the case is not settled, all Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures are due 30 days prior to Pretrial Conference. Motions in limine deadline - 5/19/2023. Responses for motions in limine - 5/26/2023. Proposed voir dire, jury instructions, and verdict form - 6/26/2023. The Plaintiff's portion of the proposed integrated pretrial order shall be submitted to opposing counsel by 6/22/2023, Integrated pretrial order - 6/29/2023. Pretrial Conference/Final Settlement Conference on 7/6/2023 at 1:30 PM. Trial on 7/17/2023 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 5/23/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (btm)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to #11 Response In Opposition. (Rutherford, Shannon)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Jack Hagewood, Glacier Resources, LLC, Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix. (White, Wesley) (Modified on 5/19/2022 to add party filers) (kew).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE by Jack Hagewood, Glacier Resources, LLC in opposition to #8 MOTION by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to Stay Pending Resolution of #5 Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County (White, Wesley) (Modified on 5/12/2022 to add party filer) (kew).
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to #7 Response In Opposition. (Rutherford, Shannon)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix in support of #8 MOTION by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to Stay Pending Resolution of #5 Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County. (Rutherford, Shannon)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to Stay Pending Resolution of #5 Motion to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County. (Rutherford, Shannon) (Modified on 5/3/2022 to correct link) (kew).
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE by Jack Hagewood, Glacier Resources, LLC in opposition to #5 MOTION by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County. (White, Wesley) (Modified on 5/3/2022 to add party filer) (kew).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix in support of #5 MOTION by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County. (Rutherford, Shannon)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION by Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix to Remand Case to Circuit Court of Fayette County (Rutherford, Shannon)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jack Hagewood, Glacier Resources, LLC with Jury Demand and COUNTERCLAIM by Jack Hagewood against Active Resources, Inc., Jon Nix. (White, Wesley) (Modified on 4/19/2022 to add party filer) (kew).
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 5/3/2022. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 5/10/2022. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 5/17/2022. Scheduling Conference at 2:00 PM in Charleston, West Virginia on 6/2/2022, before the undersigned, unless cancelled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 6/9/2022. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) initial disclosures pre-discovery - 6/16/2022. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 4/12/2022. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jack Hagewood, Glacier Resources, LLC with summons, complaint, docket sheet and other miscellaneous documents from Circuit Court of Fayette County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8167511. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Active Resources, Inc. et al v. Hagewood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Active Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jon Nix
Represented By: Alex J. Zurbuch
Represented By: Jared M. Tully
Represented By: Shannon Leigh Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Jack Hagewood
Represented By: Wesley H. White
Represented By: Eric T. Frye
Represented By: Thomas K. Fast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Glacier Resources, LLC
Represented By: Eric T. Frye
Represented By: Thomas K. Fast
Represented By: Wesley H. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?