Rogers v. Tarbox et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Rogers
Defendant: Craig A. Tarbox, Riverside Transportation, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc. and John Doe Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00499
Filed: October 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Patricia Rogers in opposition #4 PARTIAL MOTION by Riverside Transport, Inc., Riverside Transportation, Inc., Craig A. Tarbox to Dismiss Complaint. (Roush, Jennifer)
November 4, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Riverside Transport, Inc., Riverside Transportation, Inc., Craig A. Tarbox in support of #4 PARTIAL MOTION by Riverside Transport, Inc., Riverside Transportation, Inc., Craig A. Tarbox to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Brennan, Julie)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 PARTIAL MOTION by Riverside Transport, Inc., Riverside Transportation, Inc., Craig A. Tarbox to Dismiss Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal. (Brennan, Julie) (Modified on 11/7/2022 to add link to #1 notice of removal) (ts).
November 4, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ATTACHED TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Riverside Transport, Inc., Riverside Transportation, Inc., Craig A. Tarbox. (Brennan, Julie)
October 31, 2022 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
October 28, 2022 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
October 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Riverside Transportation, Inc., Riverside Transport, Inc., and Craig A. Tarbox with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Fayette County. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-8298820. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (klc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Tarbox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Rogers
Represented By: Jennifer D. Roush
Represented By: Robert A. Campbell
Represented By: Stephen B. Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig A. Tarbox
Represented By: Julie Brennan
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Brennan
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverside Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Brennan
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?