North Avenue Capital, LLC v. Ranger Scientific LLC
Plaintiff: North Avenue Capital, LLC
Defendant: Ranger Scientific LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00015
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER directing that the scheduling conference is cancelled and that this case shall proceed as follows: Amendment of pleadings and joinder of parties - 8/21/2023. Deadline for written discovery requests - 11/28/2023. Expert disclosure by party with burden of proof - 11/13/2023. Expert disclosure by opposing party - 12/13/2023. Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes - 12/29/2023. Deposition deadline and close of discovery - 1/12/2024. Filing of dispositive motions - 2/1/2024. Responses to dispositive motions - 2/15/2024. Reply to response to dispositive motion - 2/22/2024. Settlement meeting - 12/13/2023. Filing of motions in limine - 4/10/2024. Responses to motions in limine - 4/17/2024. Plaintiff draft of pretrial order to defendant - 4/8/2024. Integrated pretrial order filed by defendant - 4/15/2024. Pretrial conference on 5/8/2024 at 10:00 AM. Proposed jury instructions filed - 5/14/2024. Final settlement conference on 5/20/2024 at 9:00 AM. Trial on 5/21/2024 at 8:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/9/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (lca)
May 8, 2023 Filing 12 RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by North Avenue Capital, LLC, Ranger Scientific LLC. (Hudkins, Trisha) (Modified on 5/9/2023 to add party filer) (kew).
April 14, 2023 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Counterclaim by North Avenue Capital, LLC. (Hudkins, Trisha)
March 29, 2023 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from David S. Denton on behalf of North Avenue Capital, LLC. Local counsel: Trisha R. Hudkins. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8393159. (Hudkins, Trisha)
March 29, 2023 Filing 9 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Brandi J. McKay on behalf of North Avenue Capital, LLC. Local counsel: Trisha R. Hudkins. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8393115. (Hudkins, Trisha)
March 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) - 4/17/2023. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 5/1/2023. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) meeting - 5/8/2023. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 AM on 5/22/2023 at the Robert C. Byrd United States Courthouse, 300 Virginia Street East, Room 6610 (Library/Conference Room), Charleston, WV. Entry of scheduling order - 5/30/2023. Last day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 6/6/2023. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/27/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (mfo)
March 24, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER TO #1 Complaint With Jury Demand by Ranger Scientific LLC and COUNTERCLAIM by Ranger Scientific LLC against North Avenue Capital, LLC. (Adkins, Drannon) (Modified on 3/27/2023 to add jury demand) (kew).
March 17, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME for Ranger Scientific, LLC to Answer Complaint to March 24, 2023 by Ranger Scientific LLC, North Avenue Capital, LLC (Adkins, Drannon) (Modified on 3/17/2023 to add party filer) (mk).
March 17, 2023 SET ANSWER DEADLINE for Ranger Scientific LLC to 3/24/2023 pursuant to #6 Stipulation. (mk)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Drannon L. Adkins on 01/18/2023. Ranger Scientific LLC waiver mailed on 1/18/2023, answer due 3/20/2023. (Adkins, Drannon)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 9, 2023 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
January 9, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff North Avenue Capital, LLC (Hudkins, Trisha)
January 9, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ranger Scientific LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)
January 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8340772. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Summons as to Ranger Scientific LLC, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (kew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Avenue Capital, LLC v. Ranger Scientific LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Avenue Capital, LLC
Represented By: Trisha Hudkins
Represented By: John J. Richardson
Represented By: Brandi J. McKay
Represented By: David S. Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranger Scientific LLC
Represented By: Drannon L. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?