Women's Health Center of West Virginia et al v. Sheth et al
Plaintiff: Women's Health Center of West Virginia and Dr. John Doe
Defendant: Ashish P. Sheth and Matthew Christiansen
Intervenor Plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Case Number: 2:2023cv00079
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Irene C Berger
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia in opposition to #35 MOTION by Matthew Christiansen, Ashish P. Sheth to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Pomponio, Bren) (Modified on 3/23/2023 to remove link to #36 memorandum) (kew).
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPLY MEMORANDUM by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia to #37 Response In Opposition. (Pomponio, Bren)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess to the extent it seeks to file exhibits, and granted in part to the extent it seeks an extension of the page limit; directing that the Plaintiffs a reply brief no more than 25 pages by 3/20/2023. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/16/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Bren J. Pomponio for Angeline X. Chen updating name and/or firm information on behalf of John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia. (Pomponio, Bren)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Leave to File Brief in Excess of Page Limitation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Pomponio, Bren)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM by State of West Virginia in support of #43 MOTION by State of West Virginia to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Capehart, Curtis)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MOTION by State of West Virginia to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Capehart, Curtis) (Modified on 3/20/2023 to add link to #1 complaint) (kew).
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 UNOPPOSED MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Extension of Time for Briefing; directing the following deadlines: State's motion to dismiss is due by 3/15/2023. Plaintiffs' response is due by 3/22/2023. Defendants' reply is due by 4/5/2023. Plaintiffs' response to the State's anticipated motion to dismiss is due by 4/10/2023. State's reply is due by 4/21/2023. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 3/7/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 UNOPPOSED MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Extension of Time for Briefing re: #35 MOTION by Matthew Christiansen, Ashish P. Sheth to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Julia C. Payne on behalf of State of West Virginia. Local counsel: Curtis R. A. Capehart. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8372891. (Capehart, Curtis)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Denise M. Harle on behalf of State of West Virginia. Local counsel: Curtis R. A. Capehart. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8372771. (Capehart, Curtis)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE by State of West Virginia in opposition to #3 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1)(Capehart, Curtis)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE by Matthew Christiansen, Ashish P. Sheth in opposition to #3 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Preliminary Injunction (Green, Roberta)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Matthew Christiansen, Ashish P. Sheth in support of #35 MOTION by Matthew Christiansen, Ashish P. Sheth to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Green, Roberta)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION by Matthew Christiansen, Ashish P. Sheth to Dismiss #1 Complaint. (Green, Roberta)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting State of West Virginia's #32 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Intervene; the State of West Virginia is permitted to intervene; directing that the State respond to the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 2/27/2023 and Plaintiffs' file a reply by 3/15/2023. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/21/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by State of West Virginia in support of #32 UNOPPOSED MOTION by State of West Virginia to Intervene and for Proposed Response Deadline. (Capehart, Curtis)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 UNOPPOSED MOTION by State of West Virginia to Intervene and for Proposed Response Deadline. (Capehart, Curtis)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 DECLARATION in support of #6 Motion for Protective Order filed pursuant to the #30 Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (lca)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Dr. John Doe's #6 MOTION to proceed under Pseudonym and for a Protective Order and granting Plaintiffs' #8 MOTION to Seal; directing that the exhibits attached to the #8 Motion be filed under seal; the parties, their counsel and counsels employees are hereby ordered to keep the identity of Dr. Doe, as presented in the declaration, filed under seal, strictly confidential and are prohibited from disclosing Dr. Does identity publicly or to any individual not subject to this Protective Order. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/16/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for ECF No. 28, Order. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER directing the Defendants to file a written response to the #3 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Preliminary Injunction by 2/27/2023; counsel for the Plaintiffs are directed to serve this Order on the Defendants. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/9/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for USB drive with the Exhibits of the Audio Recordings referenced in ECF No. 3.8 of "Declaration of Darina A. Shtrakhman" (USB maintained in the office of the Clerk). (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe for Memorandum in Support of Motion Preliminary Injunction. (Pomponio, Bren) (Modified on 2/6/2023 to convert event to certificate of service) (kew).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Matthew Christiansen, re: #1 Complaint. Matthew Christiansen served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. (Pomponio, Bren) (Modified on 2/6/2023 to add service and answer due dates) (kew).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Ashish P. Sheth, re: #1 Complaint . Ashish P. Sheth served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. (Pomponio, Bren) (Modified on 2/6/2023 to add service and answer due dates) (kew).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Reece Trevor on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358189. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Rachel Reeves on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358186. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Patrick Hayden on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358178. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Marc Suskin on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358173. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Michael Bannon on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358168. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from K.C. Jaski on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358164. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Kathleen Hartnett on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358159. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Kathleen Goodhart on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358154. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Julie M. Veroff on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358150. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Darina A. Shtrakhman on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358139. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Alexander Robledo on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358133. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Alexa Kolbi-Molinas on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358124. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Angeline X. Chen on behalf of Women's Health Center of West Virginia, John Doe. Local counsel: Bren J. Pomponio. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8358104. (Pomponio, Bren)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Women's Health Center of West Virginia and Dr. John Doe in support of the #3 MOTION by Women's Health Center of West Virginia and Dr. John Doe for Preliminary Injunction (filed pursuant to #9 Order) (arb)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting the #4 MOTION by Women's Health Center of West Virginia and Dr. John Doe for Leave to File Brief in Excess of the Page Limitation of Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2); further directing that the [4-1] Memorandum be FILED. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 2/2/2023. (cc: counsel of record and any unrepresented party) (arb)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Leave to File Declaration and Exhibit 1 in Support of Motion for Protective Order Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Sealed Document, #3 Sealed Document)(Pomponio, Bren)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiffs John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia (Pomponio, Bren)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia to Proceed Under Pseudonym and for a Protective Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (under Seal), #2 Exhibit 1 of Declaration (under seal), #3 Declaration of Dr. John Doe in Support, #4 Proposed Order)(Pomponio, Bren)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Leave to File Brief in Excess of the Page Limitation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Pomponio, Bren)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration (Quinonez), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration (Dr. John Doe), #3 Exhibit 2.1 - Declaration Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2.2 - Declaration Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 2.3 - Declaration Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 3 - Declaration (Nichols), #7 Exhibit 3.1 - Declaration Exhibit 1, #8 Exhibit 4 - Declaration (Shtrakhman), #9 Exhibit 4.1 - Declaration Exhibit A, #10 Exhibit 4.2 - Declaration Exhibit B, #11 Exhibit 4.3 - Declaration Exhibit C, #12 Exhibit 4.4 - Declaration Exhibit D, #13 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pomponio, Bren)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ashish P. Sheth, Matthew Christiansen, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons - Matthew Christiansen) (btm)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8356785. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Summons - Ashish P. Sheth, #3 Proposed Summons - Matthew Christiansen, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (btm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Women's Health Center of West Virginia et al v. Sheth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Women's Health Center of West Virginia
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Aubrey Sparks
Represented By: Nicholas Ward
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Angeline X. Chen
Represented By: Darina A. Shtrakhman
Represented By: Alexander Robledo
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Katherine Christine Jaski
Represented By: Kathleen Howard Goodhart
Represented By: Kathleen R Hartnett
Represented By: Marc Suskin
Represented By: Maurice W. Trevor
Represented By: Michael Bannon
Represented By: Patrick J. Hayden
Represented By: Rachel Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. John Doe
Represented By: Aubrey Sparks
Represented By: Bren J. Pomponio
Represented By: Nicholas Ward
Represented By: Julie Veroff
Represented By: Alexa Kolbi-Molinas
Represented By: Alexander Robledo
Represented By: Angeline X. Chen
Represented By: Darina A. Shtrakhman
Represented By: Katherine Christine Jaski
Represented By: Marc Suskin
Represented By: Rachel Reeves
Represented By: Maurice W. Trevor
Represented By: Michael Bannon
Represented By: Kathleen Howard Goodhart
Represented By: Kathleen R Hartnett
Represented By: Patrick J. Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashish P. Sheth
Represented By: Caleb B. David
Represented By: Roberta F. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Christiansen
Represented By: Roberta F. Green
Represented By: Caleb B. David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: State of West Virginia
Represented By: Curtis R. Capehart
Represented By: Julia C. Payne
Represented By: Denise M. Harle
Represented By: Douglas P. Buffington, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?