AVN Corporation v. Research Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: AVN Corporation
Defendant: Research Technologies, LLC and Rodman Eggen
Case Number: 2:2023cv00149
Filed: February 22, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: John T Copenhaver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2023 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Rodman Eggen, re: #1 Complaint. Rodman Eggen served on 3/3/2023, answer due 3/24/2023. (Mullins, Michael) (Modified on 3/7/2023 to correct link) (kew).
March 6, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Research Technologies, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Research Technologies, LLC served on 3/3/2023, answer due 3/24/2023. (Mullins, Michael) (Modified on 3/7/2023 to correct link) (kew).
February 28, 2023 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rodman Eggen, Research Technologies, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons Issued as to Rodman Eggen) (kew)
February 27, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by AVN Corporation for Rodman Eggen, re: #1 Complaint. (Mullins, Michael)
February 27, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS SUBMITTED by AVN Corporation for Research Technologies, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Mullins, Michael)
February 23, 2023 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
February 22, 2023 CASE assigned to Senior Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
February 22, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Plaintiff AVN Corporation (Mullins, Michael)
February 22, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8369786. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AVN Corporation v. Research Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVN Corporation
Represented By: Michael D. Mullins
Represented By: Peter J. Raupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodman Eggen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?