Cox v. Ames
Petitioner: Christopher Cox
Respondent: Donald F. Ames
Case Number: 2:2023cv00577
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Omar J Aboulhosn
Referring Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2023 Filing 9 RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from West Virginia Attorney General on 9/28/2023 re: #8 Order; Signed for on 9/27/2023, signature not legible. (msa)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Respondent to file a limited Response addressing the timeliness of Petitioner's #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by 10/31/2023; Petitioner may file a Reply or Objections to Respondent's Response by 11/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 9/26/2023. (Attachment: #1 WV Attorney General - Certified Receipt) (cc: WV Attorney General w/#2 Petition-Cert Mail RRR; Petitioner) (msa)
September 25, 2023 Filing 7 Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 2001687. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (mfo)
August 31, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gail Lipscomb on behalf of Donald F. Ames. (Lipscomb, Gail)
August 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Petitioner's #1 APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs; Petitioner is directed to pay the filing fee of $5.00 to the Clerk on or before 9/29/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/30/2023. (cc: Petitioner; counsel of record) (lca)
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
August 28, 2023 CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF PETITION UNDER 28 USC 2254 FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (cc: counsel of record, Petitioner, Respondent) (lca)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Christopher Cox against Donald F. Ames pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2254. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Clerk Letter, #4 Envelope) (lca)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 APPLICATION by Christopher Cox to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (Attachment: #1 Resident Transaction Details) (lca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald F. Ames
Represented By: Karen Villanueva-Matkovich
Represented By: Gail Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?