Lawton v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Laverne Lawton
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00721
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas E Johnston
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER The #16 NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Rebecca Laverne Lawton and REQUEST to Stay Proceedings is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; directing that all pending dates and deadlines are VACATED; a telephonic status conference is scheduled for 5/24/2024 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Thomas E. Johnston on 12/18/2023. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew)
November 28, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC and REQUEST to Stay Proceedings. (Proctor, Jason) (Modified on 11/29/2023 to convert event to motion) (kew).
November 17, 2023 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Christopher S. McRae on behalf of Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc.. Local counsel: Jason A. Proctor. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8539139. (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sanofi US Services Inc. (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A. Proctor on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Proctor, Jason)
November 10, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Bonasso, Michael)
November 9, 2023 Filing 10 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
November 8, 2023 CASE assigned to Chief Judge Thomas E. Johnston. (klc)
November 8, 2023 Filing 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-02797. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER-Case transferred to Southern District of West Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(go) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7)(Brilleaux, Kelly) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
March 20, 2018 Filing 3 **ERROR-SEE REC. DOC. 4 FOR CORRECT ENTRY** Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) Modified on 3/20/2018 (aj). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6728310) filed by Rebecca Laverne Lawton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Panagiotis V. Albanis added to party Rebecca Laverne Lawton(pty:pla).(Albanis, Panagiotis) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/8/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawton v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By: Christopher S. McRae
Represented By: Stephen Evans Nichols
Represented By: Michael Bonasso
Represented By: Jason A. Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Laverne Lawton
Represented By: Panagiotis V. Albanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?