Rutter v. Tibbs et al
Plaintiff: Damien Rutter
Defendant: Lt. Timothy Tibbs, Corporal Michael Costello and Steve Caudill
Case Number: 2:2024cv00026
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joseph R Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Kimberly M. Bandy on 03/04/2024. Steve Caudill waiver mailed on 3/4/2024, answer due 5/3/2024. (Bandy, Kimberly)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Harrison Cyrus on 2/27/24. Timothy Tibbs waiver mailed on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (Stroebel, Paul)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Harrison Cyrus on 2/27/24. Michael Costello waiver mailed on 2/20/2024, answer due 4/22/2024. (Stroebel, Paul)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8571289. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mfo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the West Virginia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rutter v. Tibbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Rutter
Represented By: Paul E. Stroebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Timothy Tibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Michael Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Caudill
Represented By: Kimberly M. Bandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?